EP3694874 - METHODS OF INDUCING COMPLEMENT ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.05.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.04.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bioverativ USA Inc. 951 Gateway Boulevard South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | [2020/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PANICKER, Sandip 951 Gateway Blvd. South San Francisco California 94080 / US | 02 /
MOORE, Stephen 951 Gateway Blvd. South San Francisco California 94080 / US | 03 /
NIKITIN, Pavel 951 Gateway Blvd. South San Francisco California 94080 / US | 04 /
BYUN, Tony 951 Gateway Blvd. South San Francisco California 94080 / US | 05 /
PARRY, Graham 951 Gateway Blvd. South San Francisco California 94080 / US | [2020/34] | Representative(s) | Zwicker, Jörk ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Hansastraße 32 80686 München / DE | [2020/34] | Application number, filing date | 18801089.6 | 11.10.2018 | [2020/34] | WO2018US55444 | Priority number, date | US201762570953P | 11.10.2017 Original published format: US 201762570953 P | US201862637135P | 01.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862637135 P | [2020/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019075220 | Date: | 18.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3694874 | Date: | 19.08.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.04.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/18, C07K16/40 | [2020/34] | CPC: |
C07K16/18 (EP,US);
C07K16/40 (EP);
A61K2039/505 (EP);
C07K2317/31 (US);
C07K2317/565 (US);
C07K2317/73 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/34] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR INDUKTION VON KOMPLEMENTAKTIVITÄT | [2020/34] | English: | METHODS OF INDUCING COMPLEMENT ACTIVITY | [2020/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉS PERMETTANT D'INDUIRE UNE ACTIVITÉ DE COMPLÉMENT | [2020/34] | Entry into regional phase | 05.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 05.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/34] | 05.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2009029669 (NOVELMED THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6 * examples 1-10; claims 1-74 * [I] 4,7-15; | [XI]WO2013152020 (NOVELMED THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [X] 1-3,5,6 * examples 1-7; claims 1-53 * [I] 4,7-15; | [XP]WO2017176651 (TRUE NORTH THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [XP] 1-6* claims 1-3 * | by applicant | WO9303769 | WO9309239 | WO9319191 | WO9412649 | WO9428938 | WO9500655 | WO9511984 | WO9617951 | WO9712622 | WO9817815 | WO9817816 | WO9818934 | WO9931251 | WO0020561 | US6447784 | WO03042361 | US2004131637 | WO2007004670 | WO2007148971 | US2013195801 | US8734809 | - PULKKINEN; MILLER, J. Bacteriol., (19910000), vol. 173, no. 1, pages 86 - 93 | - ALPUCHE-ARANDA et al., PNAS, (19920000), vol. 89, no. 21, pages 10079 - 83 | - HARBORNE et al., Mol. Micro., (19920000), vol. 6, pages 2805 - 2813 | - DUNSTAN et al., Infect. Immun., (19990000), vol. 67, pages 5133 - 5141 | - MCKELVIE et al., Vaccine, (20040000), vol. 22, pages 3243 - 3255 | - CHATFIELD et al., Biotechnol., (19920000), vol. 10, pages 888 - 892 | - "GenBank", Database accession no. AX798980 | - "GenBank", Database accession no. AX798961 | - "GenBank", Database accession no. AX798183 | - SHETRON-RAMA et al., Infect. Immun., (20020000), vol. 70, pages 1087 - 1096 | - VALDIVIA; FALKOW, Mol. Microbiol., (19960000), vol. 22, page 367 | - HILLEN,W.; WISSMANN, A., Topics in Molecular and Structural Biology, Protein-Nucleic Acid Interaction, Macmillan, (19890000), vol. 10, pages 143 - 162 | - MELTON et al., Nucl. Acids Res., (19840000), vol. 12, page 7035 | - DEBOER et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. U.S.A., (19830000), vol. 80, pages 21 - 25 | - LI et al., Invest Opthalmol Vis Sci, (19940000), vol. 35, page 2543 2549 | - BORRAS et al., Gene Ther, (19990000), vol. 6, page 515 524 | - LI; DAVIDSON, PNAS, (19950000), vol. 92, page 7700 7704 | - SAKAMOTO et al., H Gene Ther, (19990000), vol. 5, page 1088 1097 | - ALI et al., Hum Gene Ther, (19980000), vol. 9, page 81 86 | - FLANNERY et al., PNAS, (19970000), vol. 94, page 6916 6921 | - BENNETT et al., Invest Opthalmol Vis Sci, (19970000), vol. 38, page 2857 2863 | - JOMARY et al., Gene Ther, (19970000), vol. 4, page 683 690 | - ROLLING et al., Hum Gene Ther, (19990000), vol. 10, page 641 648 | - ALI et al., Hum Mol Genet, (19960000), vol. 5, page 591 594 | - SAMULSKI et al., J. Vir., (19890000), vol. 63, pages 3822 - 3828 | - MENDELSON et al., Virol., (19880000), vol. 166, pages 154 - 165 | - FLOTTE et al., PNAS, (19930000), vol. 90, pages 10613 - 10617 | - MIYOSHI et al., PNAS, (19970000), vol. 94, page 10319 23 | - TAKAHASHI et al., J Virol, (19990000), vol. 73, page 7812 7816 | - MURRY, E. J., Methods in Molecular Biology, Humana Press, Inc., (19910000), vol. 7 | - "GenBank", Database accession no. U89790 | - "GenBank", Database accession no. J01901 | - "GenBank", Database accession no. AF043303 | - "GenBank", Database accession no. AF085716 | - CHLORINI et al., J. Vir., (19970000), vol. 71, pages 6823 - 33 | - SRIVASTAVA et al., J. Vir., (19830000), vol. 45, pages 555 - 64 | - CHLORINI et al., J. Vir., (19990000), vol. 73, pages 1309 - 1319 | - RUTLEDGE et al., J. Vir., (19980000), vol. 72, pages 309 - 319 | - WU et al., J. Vir., (20000000), vol. 74, pages 8635 - 47 | - DALKARA, D et al., Sci Transl. Med., (20130000), vol. 5, no. 189, page 189ra76 | - KOTTERMAN, MA Nat. Rev. Genet., (20140000), vol. 15, no. 7, page 455 | - CARRIER et al., J. Immunol., (19920000), vol. 148, pages 1176 - 1181 | - SIZEMORE et al., Science, (19950000), vol. 270, pages 299 - 302 | - RIDGWAY, A. A. G., "Mammalian Expression Vectors (chapter 24.2)", RIDGWAY, A. A. G., Rodriguez and Denhardt, Vectors, Butterworths, (19880000), pages 470 - 472 | WO1997US15692 | WO2002US33692 | WO2002US33630 |