EP3703895 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR STARTING AN ENGINE USING A PERMANENT MAGNET GENERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.08.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.05.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.09.2022 [2022/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Illinois Tool Works Inc. 155 Harlem Avenue Glenview, IL 60025 / US | [2020/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IHDE, Jeffrey R. c/o Illinois Tool Works Inc. 155 Harlem Avenue Glenview, Illinois 60025 / US | [2020/37] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/37] | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 18801224.9 | 30.10.2018 | [2020/37] | WO2018US58101 | Priority number, date | US201715797924 | 30.10.2017 Original published format: US201715797924 | [2020/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019089509 | Date: | 09.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3703895 | Date: | 09.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B23K9/10, F02N11/04, F02B63/04, H02J7/00, F02N11/08 | [2020/37] | CPC: |
F02N11/0803 (EP,US);
B23K9/10 (US);
B23K9/1006 (EP,US);
F02N11/04 (EP,US);
F02N11/0814 (EP,US);
F02N11/0862 (US);
H02J7/0048 (EP,US);
H02J7/0068 (EP,US);
H02J7/007182 (EP,US);
H02J7/1415 (EP,US);
H02J7/34 (EP,US);
H02K11/20 (US);
H02K11/33 (US);
H02K7/1815 (US);
H02P9/04 (US);
F02N2011/0885 (EP,US);
F02N2200/022 (EP,US);
F02N2200/061 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/37] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUM STARTEN EINES MOTORS UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES PERMANENTMAGNETGENERATORS | [2020/37] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR STARTING AN ENGINE USING A PERMANENT MAGNET GENERATOR | [2020/37] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉMARRAGE D'UN MOTEUR À L'AIDE D'UN GÉNÉRATEUR À AIMANTS PERMANENTS | [2020/37] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/37] | 25.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/39] | 24.05.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2022/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2021 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0015455 (PAICE CORP [US]) [X] 1-10,12-20 * page 45, lines 5-12; figures 3,5 * * page 49, line 15 - line 26; figure 6 *; | [XY]US2005109550 (BUGLIONE ARTHUR J [US], et al) [X] 1-3,11,12 * paragraphs [0027] , [0038] , [0056]; figures 1,7-9 *[Y] 1-20; | [Y]US2006037953 (MATTHEWS WILLIAM T [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * paragraphs [0012] , [0 35]; figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0035] *; | [XAI]US2007120366 (GRANT JEFFREY P [US], et al) [X] 1,12 * paragraphs [0060] , [0 83]; figures 3-8,23-24 * [A] 2-10,13-20 [I] 11; | [XY]US2010314181 (BEESON RICHARD [US]) [X] 1-3,11,12 * paragraph [0029]; figure 5 * [Y] 1-20; | [Y]US2016067809 (ENYEDY EDWARD [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * paragraphs [0031] - [0033] - [0 41] , [0 46] - [0050] - [0 64]; figures 6-10 * |