EP3628042 - LIQUID ISOMERIZATION FOR METATHESIS PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.02.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Technip Process Technology, Inc. 11740 Katy Freeway Houston, Texas 77079 / US | [2020/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EVITT, Steven 11740 Katy Freeway Houston, Texas 77079 / US | 02 /
VAN EGMOND, Cornelis F. 11740 Katy Freeway Houston, Texas 77079 / US | 03 /
REICH, Veronique Rue Jean Hur B.P. N 7 76580 Le Trait / FR | 04 /
SIMON, Yvon Rue Jean Hur B.P. N 7 76580 Le Trait / FR | 05 /
DESTOUR, Bruno Rue Jean Hur B.P. N 7 76580 Le Trait / FR | [2020/14] | Representative(s) | McWilliams, David John Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/14] | Müller Schupfner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Schellerdamm 19 21079 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 18802445.9 | 13.02.2018 | [2020/14] | WO2018US17957 | Priority number, date | US201762506047P | 15.05.2017 Original published format: US 201762506047 P | [2020/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018212812 | Date: | 22.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3628042 | Date: | 01.04.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.11.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07C7/163, C07C11/06, C07C6/04, C07C5/25, C07C11/08, C07C7/04, C07C7/00 | [2021/16] | CPC: |
C07C5/2556 (EP);
C07C6/04 (EP,US);
C07C7/005 (EP);
C07C7/04 (EP,US);
C07C11/06 (US);
C07C11/08 (US);
C07C2521/04 (EP);
C07C2521/08 (EP);
C07C2523/30 (EP);
C07C2523/36 (EP);
C07C2523/44 (EP);
C07C5/25 (US);
Y02P20/52 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C5/2556, C07C11/08 (EP);
C07C6/04, C07C11/06 (EP);
C07C7/005, C07C11/06 (EP);
C07C7/04, C07C11/06 (EP) |
Former IPC [2020/14] | C07C7/163, C07C11/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/14] | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKEITSISOMERISIERUNG FÜR METATHESEVERFAHREN | [2020/14] | English: | LIQUID ISOMERIZATION FOR METATHESIS PROCESS | [2020/14] | French: | ISOMÉRISATION DE LIQUIDE POUR PROCÉDÉ DE MÉTATHÈSE | [2020/14] | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.2019 | Search fee paid | 05.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/14] | 21.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.10.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to appoint a representative | 02.11.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 02.11.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.11.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]EP0742195 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR]); | [XYI]EP1110934 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR]); | [XI]FR2802920 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR]); | [XI]US2010286458 (ISELBORN STEFAN [DE], et al); | [XI]WO2012147047 (BASF SE [DE], et al); | [Y]EP2563749 (SAUDI BASIC IND CORP [SA]) | International search | [XY]US6166279 (SCHWAB PETER [DE], et al); | [Y]US7459593 (KRUPA STEVEN L [US], et al); | [A]US7576251 (GARTSIDE ROBERT J [US], et al); | [A]US2010041930 (GARTSIDE ROBERT J [US], et al); | [Y]US2016023964 (CHOI SUKWON [US], et al) | by applicant | EP0742195 | EP1110934 | FR2802920 | US2010286458 | WO2012147047 |