EP3636620 - SILICON CARBIDE CERAMIC [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2022 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyoto University 36-1, Yoshida-honmachi Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 606-8501 / JP | [2020/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HINOKI, Tatsuya c/o Kyoto University 36-1 Yoshida-honmachi Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 606-8501 / JP | 02 /
YANAGAWA, Shohei c/o Kyoto University 36-1 Yoshida-honmachi Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 606-8501 / JP | [2020/16] | Representative(s) | Gevers & Orès Immeuble le Palatin 2 3 Cours du Triangle CS 80165 92939 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [2020/16] | Application number, filing date | 18802788.2 | 14.05.2018 | [2020/16] | WO2018JP18601 | Priority number, date | JP20170096885 | 15.05.2017 Original published format: JP 2017096885 | [2020/16] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018212139 | Date: | 22.11.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3636620 | Date: | 15.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.11.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/565, C04B35/569, C04B35/80, C04B41/80, C04B41/87, C04B35/573 | [2021/03] | CPC: |
C04B35/565 (EP,US);
C04B35/573 (EP,US);
C04B35/62222 (EP);
C04B35/62625 (US);
C04B35/62863 (US);
C04B35/64 (US);
C04B35/80 (EP,US);
C04B41/009 (EP,US);
C04B41/4556 (US);
C04B41/5024 (EP,US);
C04B41/85 (EP);
C04B41/87 (US);
C04B2235/3217 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3224 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3225 (EP);
C04B2235/3427 (EP);
C04B2235/3826 (US);
C04B2235/3852 (US);
C04B2235/386 (EP);
C04B2235/422 (US);
C04B2235/428 (US);
C04B2235/5224 (EP);
C04B2235/5244 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5248 (EP);
C04B2235/5252 (US);
C04B2235/5436 (EP);
C04B2235/5445 (EP);
C04B2235/616 (US);
C04B2235/6588 (EP);
C04B2235/663 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C04B35/806, C04B41/009, C04B35/565 (EP);
C04B41/5024, C04B41/4556, C04B2103/0021 (EP) |
Former IPC [2020/16] | C04B35/569, C04B35/80, C04B41/80, C04B41/87 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/16] | Title | German: | SILICIUMCARBID-KERAMIK | [2020/16] | English: | SILICON CARBIDE CERAMIC | [2020/16] | French: | CÉRAMIQUE DE CARBURE DE SILICIUM | [2020/16] | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.2019 | Translation filed | 09.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.2019 | Search fee paid | 09.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.2018 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 09.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/16] | 21.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2002063118 (KOSHKARIAN KENT A [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * claims 1, 3, 6, 7, 13 * * paragraphs [0021] , [0 28] * * paragraphs [0037] - [0038]; example 1 *; | [A]EP2272812 (SAINT GOBAIN CERAMICS [US]) [A] 1-13 * claims 1-4, 6-7 *; | [XY]EP2639211 (UNIV KYOTO [JP]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0008] , [0 31] , [0 36] - [0039] *[Y] 14,15; | [Y]WO2016093360 (UNIV KYOTO [JP]) [Y] 14,15 * paragraph [0005] *; | [P]EP3231782 (UNIV KYOTO [JP]) [P] * paragraph [0006] *; | [XY] - SON T. NGUYEN ET AL, "Strength improvement and purification of Yb2Si2O7 -SiC nanocomposites by surface oxidation treatment", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CERAMIC SOCIETY, US, (20170403), vol. 100, no. 7, doi:10.1111/jace.14831, ISSN 0002-7820, pages 3122 - 3131, XP055754089 [X] 1-13 * Title * * abstract * * page 3122, column 1, lines 7-10 * * page 3123, paragraph 2.Experimental Procedure * * page 3130, paragraph 4.Conclusions * [Y] 14,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/jace.14831 | International search | [A]JP2006514912 (SAINT-GOBAIN CERAMICS AND PLASTICS, INC.) [A] 1-12* , paragraphs [0007], [0019], [0020], [0035] & WO 2004/096733 A1 & EP 2272812 A2 & US 2004/0219315 A1, paragraphs [0012], [0020], [0021], [0034] *; | [XY]JP2015171985 (NGK INSULATORS LTD, et al) [X] 1-10 * , claim 1, paragraphs [0018]-[0022], [0026] & PL 411304 A * [Y] 11-12; | [Y]WO2016093360 (UNIV KYOTO [JP]) [Y] 1-12 * , paragraphs [0005], [0017] & US 2017/0341986 A1, paragraphs [0006], [0018] * | by applicant | JP2004299948 | WO2016093360 |