EP3717534 - AQUEOUS POLYURETHANE RESIN DISPERSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.02.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AGFA NV Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [2020/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERTELS, Ellen c/o AGFA NV IP Department 3622 Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | 02 /
VAN AERT, Hubertus c/o AGFA NV IP Department 3622 Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [2020/41] | Representative(s) | Lingier, Stefaan Frans L. AGFA NV Intellectual Property Department Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [2020/41] | Application number, filing date | 18803684.2 | 19.11.2018 | [2020/41] | WO2018EP81789 | Priority number, date | EP20170203971 | 28.11.2017 Original published format: EP 17203971 | [2020/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019105786 | Date: | 06.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3717534 | Date: | 07.10.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3717534 | Date: | 08.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/12, C08G18/66, C08G18/75, C08G18/08, C08G18/32, C08G18/42, C09D11/00, B41M5/00, B41M5/52, C09D11/102, C09D11/322, C09D11/40, C09D11/54, D06H1/02 | [2020/41] | CPC: |
C08G18/0809 (EP);
C08L75/06 (US);
B41M5/0011 (EP);
C08G18/12 (EP);
C08G18/3206 (EP);
C08G18/3275 (EP);
C08G18/4213 (EP);
C08G18/4227 (US);
C08G18/4825 (US);
C08G18/5021 (US);
C08G18/6655 (EP);
C08G18/6688 (EP);
C08G18/72 (US);
C08G18/755 (EP);
C08K3/013 (US);
C08K3/22 (US);
C09D11/00 (EP);
C09D11/102 (EP);
C09D11/322 (EP);
C09D11/40 (EP);
C09D11/54 (EP);
C09D17/008 (US);
B41M5/0017 (EP);
B41M5/0047 (EP);
B41M5/0058 (EP);
B41M5/0064 (EP);
B41M5/007 (EP);
B41M5/0076 (EP);
B41M5/5245 (EP);
B41M5/5281 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C08G18/12, C08G18/3206 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄSSRIGE POLYURETHANHARZDISPERSION | [2020/41] | English: | AQUEOUS POLYURETHANE RESIN DISPERSION | [2020/41] | French: | DISPERSION AQUEUSE DE RÉSINE DE POLYURÉTHANE | [2020/41] | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/41] | 29.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 27.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JP2002059638 (ASAHI DENKA KOGYO KK) [Y] 1-10* the whole document *; | [XY]US2008090949 (NAGAO KENJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,7-10 * example 5 * [Y] 1-10 | Examination | US2013316098 | by applicant | US2008090949 | WO2008074548 | US2009233065 | WO2014042652 | JP2015163678 | - FOCK, J.; MOHRING, V., "Polyether-1,2- and -1,3-diols as macromonomers for the synthesis of graft copolymers, 1. Synthesis and characterization of the macromonomers", Die Makromolekulare Chemie, (19900000), vol. 191, no. 12, pages 3045 - 3057 | - The Pigment Handbook, John Wiley & Sons, (19880000), vol. I | EP20160196224 |