EP3716943 - COMPOSITION FOR TREATING ONYCHOMYCOSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.06.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.01.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.11.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NCP NewCare Products GmbH Am Freibad 4a 25451 Quickborn / DE | [2020/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRAINBRING, Volker Gustav Adolf Marie-Curie-Straße 8 25451 Quickborn / DE | [2020/41] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstraße 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [2020/41] | Application number, filing date | 18803689.1 | 20.11.2018 | [2020/41] | WO2018EP81857 | Priority number, date | EP20170204960 | 01.12.2017 Original published format: EP 17204960 | [2020/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019105793 | Date: | 06.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3716943 | Date: | 07.10.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3716943 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/00, A61P17/00, A61K47/10, A61K9/107 | [2021/28] | CPC: |
A61K9/0014 (EP,US);
A61K9/1075 (EP,US);
A61K31/00 (EP);
A61K45/00 (US);
A61K47/10 (EP,US);
A61K47/18 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/41] | A61K9/00, A61K31/00, A61P17/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ONYCHOMYKOSE | [2020/41] | English: | COMPOSITION FOR TREATING ONYCHOMYCOSIS | [2020/41] | French: | COMPOSITIONS POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE L'ONYCHOMYCOSE | [2021/28] |
Former [2020/41] | COMPOSITION POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU CHAMPIGNON DES ONGLES | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/41] | 22.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.07.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 01.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 29.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 18.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.06.2023 | CZ | 28.06.2023 | DK | 28.06.2023 | EE | 28.06.2023 | ES | 28.06.2023 | FI | 28.06.2023 | HR | 28.06.2023 | IT | 28.06.2023 | LT | 28.06.2023 | LV | 28.06.2023 | MC | 28.06.2023 | NL | 28.06.2023 | PL | 28.06.2023 | RO | 28.06.2023 | RS | 28.06.2023 | SE | 28.06.2023 | SI | 28.06.2023 | SK | 28.06.2023 | SM | 28.06.2023 | NO | 28.09.2023 | GR | 29.09.2023 | IS | 28.10.2023 | PT | 30.10.2023 | LU | 20.11.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 28.06.2023 | |
CZ | 28.06.2023 | ||
DK | 28.06.2023 | ||
EE | 28.06.2023 | ||
ES | 28.06.2023 | ||
FI | 28.06.2023 | ||
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
IT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
MC | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
PL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RO | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
IS | 28.10.2023 | ||
PT | 30.10.2023 | ||
LU | 20.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/32] | AT | 28.06.2023 | |
CZ | 28.06.2023 | ||
DK | 28.06.2023 | ||
EE | 28.06.2023 | ||
ES | 28.06.2023 | ||
FI | 28.06.2023 | ||
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
IT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
MC | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
PL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RO | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
IS | 28.10.2023 | ||
PT | 30.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 28.06.2023 | |
CZ | 28.06.2023 | ||
DK | 28.06.2023 | ||
EE | 28.06.2023 | ||
ES | 28.06.2023 | ||
FI | 28.06.2023 | ||
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
IT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
PL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RO | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
IS | 28.10.2023 | ||
PT | 30.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 28.06.2023 | |
CZ | 28.06.2023 | ||
DK | 28.06.2023 | ||
EE | 28.06.2023 | ||
ES | 28.06.2023 | ||
FI | 28.06.2023 | ||
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
PL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RO | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
IS | 28.10.2023 | ||
PT | 30.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 28.06.2023 | |
CZ | 28.06.2023 | ||
EE | 28.06.2023 | ||
ES | 28.06.2023 | ||
FI | 28.06.2023 | ||
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
PL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RO | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
IS | 28.10.2023 | ||
PT | 30.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 28.06.2023 | |
CZ | 28.06.2023 | ||
ES | 28.06.2023 | ||
FI | 28.06.2023 | ||
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
IS | 28.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | FI | 28.06.2023 | |
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | FI | 28.06.2023 | |
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | HR | 28.06.2023 | |
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | HR | 28.06.2023 | |
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 28.06.2023 | |
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | SE | 28.06.2023 | |
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | SE | 28.06.2023 | |
NO | 28.09.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0243145 (KABARA JON JOSEPH) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * * claims 1-16 *; | [A]EP2394653 (ALMIRALL SA [ES]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document ** claims 1-14 *; | [A]EP2664327 (ALMIRALL SA [ES]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * * claims 1-18 * |