EP3698039 - BUOY AND METHOD FOR THE GENERATION OF ELECTRICAL ENERGY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2022 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.04.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BLUE MARINE S.r.l. Via Partigiani d'Italia 20 43029 Traversetolo (PR) / IT | [2021/48] |
Former [2021/36] | For all designated states Pederini, Enrico Maria Via Vittorio Veneto 29/1 42020 Quattro Castella (RE) / IT | ||
Former [2020/35] | For all designated states Torpedine S.r.l. Piazza Giacomo Matteotti 52 41121 Modena / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2021/36] |
Former [2020/35] | 01 /
PEDERINI, Enrico Maria Via Vittorio Veneto 29/1 42020 Quattro Castella (RE) / IT | Representative(s) | Cataldi, Giulia, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2020/35] | Application number, filing date | 18803768.3 | 19.10.2018 | [2020/35] | WO2018IB58132 | Priority number, date | IT20170118632 | 19.10.2017 Original published format: IT201700118632 | [2020/35] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019077563 | Date: | 25.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3698039 | Date: | 26.08.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.04.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3698039 | Date: | 04.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/31] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP3698039 | Date: | 22.09.2021 | [2021/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F03B13/20, F03B13/18 | [2020/35] | CPC: |
F03B13/20 (EP);
F03B13/1885 (EP);
F05B2250/44 (EP);
F05B2260/40311 (EP);
Y02E10/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BOJE UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON ELEKTRISCHER ENERGIE | [2020/35] | English: | BUOY AND METHOD FOR THE GENERATION OF ELECTRICAL ENERGY | [2020/35] | French: | BOUÉE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'ÉNERGIE ÉLECTRIQUE | [2020/35] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/35] | 22.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.02.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.06.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.10.2018 | AL | 04.08.2021 | AT | 04.08.2021 | CY | 04.08.2021 | CZ | 04.08.2021 | EE | 04.08.2021 | IT | 04.08.2021 | LT | 04.08.2021 | LV | 04.08.2021 | MK | 04.08.2021 | PL | 04.08.2021 | RO | 04.08.2021 | RS | 04.08.2021 | SK | 04.08.2021 | SM | 04.08.2021 | IE | 19.10.2021 | LU | 19.10.2021 | CH | 31.10.2021 | LI | 31.10.2021 | BG | 04.11.2021 | IS | 04.12.2021 | [2024/23] |
Former [2023/33] | HU | 19.10.2018 | |
AL | 04.08.2021 | ||
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CY | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
IT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
IE | 19.10.2021 | ||
LU | 19.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CY | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
IT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
IE | 19.10.2021 | ||
LU | 19.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
IT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
IE | 19.10.2021 | ||
LU | 19.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/37] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
IT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
LU | 19.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
IT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
LU | 19.10.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
LU | 19.10.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
PL | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | Cited in | International search | [XI]FR2540567 (MONANGE JACQUES [FR]) [X] 1,15 * page 2, line 36 - page 3, line 31; figure - * [I] 1-3,10,11,13,14; | [XI]DE102009012168 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,15 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0045]; figures 1-3 * [I] 1-5,12-14; | [X]DE102012223153 (SKF AB [SE]) [X] 1,4,5,14,15 * paragraph [0030]; figure 2 *; | [A]FR2409396 (FIAT SPA [IT]) [A] 1-15 * page 1, line 29 - page 4, line 34; figure - *; | [A]FR2943742 (DIEUDONNE PIERRE ANDRE MARIE [FR]) [A] 1-3,15 * page 3, line 1 - page 4, line 26; figure - *; | [A]US2014353973 (CHEN SHIH-HSIUNG [TW]) [A] 1-3,15 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0030]; figure - *; | [A]US9617972 (SKAF ROBERT GEORGES [CA]) [A] 1-3,15 * column 2, line 52 - column 4, line 28; figure - *; | [A]US3231749 (HINCK III ERNEST C) [A] 1-3,15 * column 2, line 31 - column 4, line 14; figure - * |