EP3701612 - POWER ELECTRONICS CONDITIONING SYSTEM WITH HALF-WINDING GENERATOR SETUP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.11.2021 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.05.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cummins Power Generation Ltd. (UK) Columbus Av. Manston Park Ramsgate CT12 5BF / GB | [2020/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ERNEST, Emil Banks Crescent Stamford PE9 1FF / GB | 02 /
PACIURA, Krzysztof 102 Ainsdale Peterborough PE4 6RP / GB | 03 /
PALMER, Bradford K. 3224 144th Avenue NE Ham Lake, MN 55304 / US | [2020/36] | Representative(s) | CSY London Helios Court 1 Bishop Square Hatfield Hertfordshire AL10 9NE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/36] | CSY London 10 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 18804126.3 | 22.10.2018 | [2020/36] | WO2018IB58212 | Priority number, date | US201762575920P | 23.10.2017 Original published format: US 201762575920 P | [2020/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019082059 | Date: | 02.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3701612 | Date: | 02.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H02J3/18, H02J3/32, H02P25/18 | [2020/36] | CPC: |
H02J3/32 (EP,US);
H02J3/1842 (EP,US);
H02J3/381 (US);
H02P25/18 (EP);
H02J2300/20 (US);
H02J3/1885 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/36] | Title | German: | LEISTUNGSELEKTRONIKKONDITIONIERUNGSSYSTEM MIT HALBWICKLUNGSGENERATOREINRICHTUNG | [2020/36] | English: | POWER ELECTRONICS CONDITIONING SYSTEM WITH HALF-WINDING GENERATOR SETUP | [2020/36] | French: | SYSTÈME DE CONDITIONNEMENT D'ÉLECTRONIQUE DE PUISSANCE À RÉGLAGE DE GÉNÉRATEUR À DEMI-ENROULEMENTS | [2020/36] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/36] | 11.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2011316462 (BOUCHEZ BORIS [FR], et al); | [XYI]WO2015150740 (CUMMINS GENERATOR TECHNOLOGIES [GB]); | [XY]DE102015218416 (CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE GMBH [DE]) |