EP3710424 - COMPOUNDS HAVING A STABILIZING EFFECT, METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAID COMPOUNDS, COMPOSITION CONTAINING SAID STABILIZING COMPOUNDS, METHOD FOR STABILIZING AN ORGANIC COMPONENT, AND USE OF STABILIZING COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.09.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.05.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastr. 27c 80686 München / DE | [2022/16] |
Former [2020/39] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastraße 27c 80686 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FISCHER, Johannes Seifenstraße 41 65388 Schlangenbad / DE | 02 /
METZSCH-ZILLINGEN, Elke In der Hardt 19 54597 Steffeln / DE | 03 /
PFAENDNER, Rudolf Sackgasse 3 64668 Rimbach / DE | [2020/39] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2020/39] | Application number, filing date | 18804565.2 | 14.11.2018 | [2020/39] | WO2018EP81270 | Priority number, date | DE201710220555 | 17.11.2017 Original published format: DE102017220555 | [2020/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019096868 | Date: | 23.05.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3710424 | Date: | 23.09.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3710424 | Date: | 03.01.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07C323/16, C07C319/18, C09K15/14, C08K5/372, C08K5/375 | [2020/39] | CPC: |
C07C323/16 (EP,KR,US);
C07D251/30 (KR);
C07D251/32 (US);
C07C319/18 (EP,KR);
C07C323/12 (US);
C07C323/13 (US);
C07D251/34 (US);
C08K5/3725 (EP,KR,US);
C08K5/375 (EP,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C319/18, C07C323/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGEN MIT STABILISIERENDER WIRKUNG, VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG, ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ENTHALTEND DIESE STABILISIERENDEN VERBINDUNGEN, VERFAHREN ZUR STABILISIERUNG EINER ORGANISCHEN KOMPONENTE SOWIE VERWENDUNG VON STABILISIERENDEN VERBINDUNGEN | [2020/39] | English: | COMPOUNDS HAVING A STABILIZING EFFECT, METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAID COMPOUNDS, COMPOSITION CONTAINING SAID STABILIZING COMPOUNDS, METHOD FOR STABILIZING AN ORGANIC COMPONENT, AND USE OF STABILIZING COMPOUNDS | [2020/39] | French: | COMPOSÉS À EFFET STABILISANT, LEUR PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION, COMPOSITION CONTENANT CES COMPOSÉS STABILISANTS, PROCÉDÉ DE STABILISATION D'UN COMPOSANT ORGANIQUE ET UTILISATION DE COMPOSÉS STABILISANTS | [2020/39] | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/39] | 27.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 03.01.2024 | HR | 03.01.2024 | PL | 03.01.2024 | NO | 03.04.2024 | RS | 03.04.2024 | GR | 04.04.2024 | IS | 03.05.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 03.01.2024 | |
HR | 03.01.2024 | ||
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
RS | 03.04.2024 | ||
GR | 04.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | HR | 03.01.2024 | |
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
RS | 03.04.2024 | ||
GR | 04.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | NO | 03.04.2024 | |
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 03.05.2024 | Cited in | International search | [XA]US3285855 (MARTIN DEXTER, et al) [X] 1-7,11-17 * 2-(n-octylthioethyl)-3-,5-di-t-butyl-4hydroxyphenylacetate;; example all; claim all * [A] 8-10; | [XA]GB1103145 (GEIGY AG J R) [X] 1-7,11-17 * example 9; claim all * [A] 8-10; | [XDA]DE2364126 (CIBA GEIGY AG) [XD] 1-7,11-17 * page 2; compound Formel IV * * page 9; example alle * * page 14 * [A] 8-10; | [XA]US3988363 (SPIVACK JOHN D, et al) [X] 1-7,11-17 * column 12; example 9; claim all; compound 2 * [A] 8-10; | [IA]DE3639400 (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG [DE]) [I] 1-7,11-17 * page 10; claim all; compounds 4,5 *[A] 8-10 | by applicant | US2617778 | US2642373 | US2981717 | US3245992 | US3257354 | DE2364126 | US4035337 | WO8600301 | US4633008 | US4694102 | DD251128 | US4727103 | EP0275832 | EP0428973 | WO2004033699 | - I. VULIC et al., Pol. Degr. Stab., (20020000), vol. 78, pages 27 - 34 | - C. E. HOYLE; C. N. BOWMAN, Angew. Chem. Int. Ed., (20100000), vol. 49, pages 1540 - 1573 | - A. B. LOWE, Polym. Chem., (20100000), vol. 1, pages 17 - 36 | - Z. ALTINTAS et al., Chinese Journal of Polymer Science, (20150000), vol. 6, pages 850 - 856 | - LIMNIOS, Adv. Synth. Catal., (20170000), vol. 359, pages 323 - 328 | - W. WU, J. Macromol. Sci. B, (20140000), vol. 53, pages 1244 - 1257 | - J. OTERA, Chem. Rev., (19930000), vol. 93, pages 1449 - 1470 |