EP3714532 - METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR DETERMINING AT LEAST ONE PROPERTY OF AN ELECTRIC MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.06.2024 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2024 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | 10.08.2024 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft 38440 Wolfsburg / DE | [2023/15] |
Former [2020/40] | For all designated states Universität Kassel Mönchebergstrasse 19 34125 Kassel / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRABETZ, Ludwig Stobenbleek 10 38165 Lehre / DE | 02 /
AYEB, Mohamed Schanzenstr. 60 34130 Kassel / DE | 03 /
BETHKE, Florian Hardenbergstr. 8 34119 Kassel / DE | 04 /
WALDMANN, Thomas Breitscheidstr. 7 34119 Kassel / DE | [2020/40] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] |
Former [2020/40] | Kleine, Hubertus, et al Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 18804619.7 | 19.11.2018 | [2020/40] | WO2018EP81771 | Priority number, date | DE201710127467 | 21.11.2017 Original published format: DE102017127467 | [2020/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019101688 | Date: | 31.05.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3714532 | Date: | 30.09.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H02K11/225, H02P6/18, H02P23/14 | [2024/27] | CPC: |
H02K11/225 (EP);
H02P23/14 (EP);
H02P6/183 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/40] | H02K11/225 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/40] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUM BESTIMMEN VON MINDESTENS EINER EIGENSCHAFT EINER ELEKTRISCHEN MASCHINE | [2020/40] | English: | METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR DETERMINING AT LEAST ONE PROPERTY OF AN ELECTRIC MACHINE | [2020/40] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET ARRANGEMENT POUR DÉTERMINER AU MOINS UNE PROPRIÉTÉ D'UNE MACHINE ÉLECTRIQUE | [2020/40] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/40] | 18.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2007031131 (GRIFFITTS JONATHAN C [US]); | [YDA]DE102015107666 (UNIV KASSEL [DE]); | [Y]JP2017028804 (NISSAN MOTOR) | by applicant | DE102015107666 |