EP3704626 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR OPTICAL MATERIAL CHARACTERIZATION OF WASTE MATERIALS USING MACHINE LEARNING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.04.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.05.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amp Robotics Corporation 1500 Cherry St. Suite A Louisville, Colorado 80027 / US | [2020/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOROWITZ, Matanya B. c/o AMP Robotics Corporation 1500 Cherry St. Suite A Louisvile Colorado 80027 / US | 02 /
BAILEY, James A. c/o AMP Robotics Corporation 1500 Cherry St. Suite A Louisville Colorado 80027 / US | [2020/37] | Representative(s) | McKinnon, Alistair James WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/37] | Houghton, Mark Phillip Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 18804805.2 | 31.10.2018 | [2020/37] | WO2018US58552 | Priority number, date | US201762580720P | 02.11.2017 Original published format: US 201762580720 P | [2020/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019089825 | Date: | 09.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3704626 | Date: | 09.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00, G06K9/62 | [2020/37] | CPC: |
G06V10/82 (EP,US);
G06F18/41 (US);
G06T7/0008 (US);
G06T7/70 (US);
G06V10/7788 (EP,US);
G06V20/52 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/37] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR OPTISCHEN MATERIALCHARAKTERISIERUNG VON ABFALLMATERIALIEN MITHILFE VON MASCHINENLERNEN | [2020/37] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR OPTICAL MATERIAL CHARACTERIZATION OF WASTE MATERIALS USING MACHINE LEARNING | [2020/37] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR CARACTÉRISATION MATÉRIELLE OPTIQUE DE DÉCHETS PAR APPRENTISSAGE AUTOMATIQUE | [2020/37] | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/37] | 22.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US7449655 (COWLING DONALD [GB], et al) [A] 1-3,8-21,26,30-34,38-42 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2014179667 (ECOWASTEHUB CORP [US]) [A] 1-3,8-21,26,30-34,38-42* the whole document *; | [XI] - Dr Tuomas ET AL, "ZenRobotics Recycler - Robotic Sorting using Machine Learning", (20140313), URL: https://users.ics.aalto.fi/praiko/papers/SBS14.pdf, (20190204), XP055551303 [X] 1,2,8-17,19,26,30-34,38-40,42 * abstract * * page 3, paragraph 1; figures 1,2 * * page 4, paragraph 1 - paragraph 3; figure 3 * * page 6 * [I] 3,18,20,21,41 | [T] - SATHISH PAULRAJ GUNDUPALLI ET AL, "A review on automated sorting of source-separated municipal solid waste for recycling", WASTE MANAGEMENT., US, (20160920), vol. 60, doi:10.1016/j.wasman.2016.09.015, ISSN 0956-053X, pages 56 - 74, XP055551300 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.wasman.2016.09.015 | by applicant | - HUANG et al., "Speed/accuracy trade-offs for modem convolutional object detectors", The IEEE Conference on Computer Vision and Pattern Recognition (CVPR), (20170000), pages 7310 - 7311 |