EP3633832 - ROTOR CORE MANUFACTURING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.01.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsui High-Tec, Inc. 10-1, Komine 2-chome Yahatanishi-ku Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 807-8588 / JP | [2020/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIDA, Kohei c/o Mitsui High-tec Inc. 10-1 Komine 2-chome Yahatanishi-ku Kitakyushu-shi Fukuoka 807-8588 / JP | [2020/15] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2020/15] | Application number, filing date | 18805909.1 | 15.03.2018 | [2020/15] | WO2018JP10261 | Priority number, date | JP20170103579 | 25.05.2017 Original published format: JP 2017103579 | [2020/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018216325 | Date: | 29.11.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3633832 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.11.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H02K15/16, H02K15/03, // H02K1/27 | [2021/10] | CPC: |
H02K15/03 (EP,US);
H02K15/165 (EP,US);
H02K1/27 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/15] | H02K15/16, H02K1/22, H02K1/27, H02K15/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/15] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EINEN STATORKERN | [2020/15] | English: | ROTOR CORE MANUFACTURING METHOD | [2020/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE NOYAU DE ROTOR | [2020/15] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2019 | Translation filed | 16.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2019 | Search fee paid | 16.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/15] | 08.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/07] | 28.09.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2021 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPH11164529 (ASMO CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 2-12; | [XA]JPH09294358 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0014]; figures 2a, 2b, 2c * [A] 2-12; | [A]JP2013021829 (MITSUBA CORP) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0034] *; | [A]JP2015126677 (DAIKIN IND LTD) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A]JPH09308151 (OPPAMA KOGYO KK) [A] 1-12 * abstract * | International search | [XA]JPH09294358 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1 * , claim 2, paragraphs [0007], [0010]-[0025], fig. 1-4 (Family: none) * [A] 2-12; | [XA]JP2016019381 (MITSUI HIGH TEC, et al) [X] 1 * , paragraphs [0019]-[0041], fig. 1-7 & US 2016/0013709 Al, paragraphs [0034]-[0088], fig. 1-7 & CN 105281457 A * [A] 2-12; | [A]JP2007124819 (ASMO CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * , paragraphs [0021]-[0025], fig. 1-2 (Family: none) *; | [A]JPS5950569U (IIDA ELECTRICAL WORKS CO., LTD.) [A] 1-12 * , pp. 4-6, fig. 1-3 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2012100499 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-12 * , paragraphs [0019]-[0034], fi. 1-10 (Family: none * | by applicant | JP2016092994 | JP2013009453 |