EP3630923 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR REPAIRING A COKE OVEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Suncoke Technology and Development LLC 1011 Warrenville Road 6th Floor Lisle, Illinois 60532 / US | [2020/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CRUM, Jason 1011 Warrenville Road 6th Floor Lisle Illinois 60532 / US | 02 /
BALL, Mark Anthony 1011 Warrenville Road 6th Floor Lisle Illinois 60532 / US | 03 /
WEST, Gary Dean 1011 Warrenville Road 6th Floor Lisle Illinois 60532 / US | 04 /
QUANCI, John Francis 1011 Warrenville Road 6th Floor Lisle Illinois 60532 / US | 05 /
CHOI, Chun Wai 1011 Warrenville Road 6th Floor Lisle Illinois 60532 / US | [2020/15] | Representative(s) | Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Straße 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/15] | Beattie, Alex Thomas Stewart Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18806103.0 | 23.05.2018 | [2020/15] | WO2018US34235 | Priority number, date | US201762510109P | 23.05.2017 Original published format: US 201762510109 P | [2020/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018217955 | Date: | 29.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3630923 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 29.11.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C10B29/06, F27D1/00 | [2021/08] | CPC: |
C10B29/06 (EP,KR,RU,US);
C10B29/02 (US);
F27B13/02 (EP);
F27D1/0033 (EP,US);
F27D1/004 (EP,US);
F27D1/0043 (EP,US);
F27D1/02 (EP,US);
F27D1/12 (EP,US);
F27D1/16 (RU);
|
Former IPC [2020/15] | C10B29/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/15] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR REPARATUR EINES KOKSOFENS | [2020/15] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR REPAIRING A COKE OVEN | [2020/15] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉPARATION D'UN FOUR À COKE | [2020/15] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2019 | Search fee paid | 14.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/15] | 20.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.09.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP2002097472 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO, et al) [X] 1,3,4,6,7,9,12,14,15 * figures 1b,2a,2b,3 * * paragraphs [0010] , [0011] , [0012] , [0013] - [0016] - [0020] - [0022] * * claims 1-5 * [I] 2,5,8,10,11,13; | [XI]JP2004169016 (JFE STEEL KK) [X] 7,9-12,15 * figures 1-5 * * claims 1-3 * * paragraphs [0013] , [0014] , [0015] , [0016] , [0021] , [0024] , [0025] , [0028] *[I] 8,13,14 | International search | [A]JPH08104875 (IIDA TAKAMICHI) [A] 1-20 * See paragraph [0010] and figure 1. *; | [A]JP2006188608 (SUMITOMO METAL IND) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0013]-[0017] and figure 4. *; | [A]US2010196597 (DI LORETO OSVALDO [BE]) [A] 1-20* See paragraphs [0001]-[0042]. *; | [A]JP2010248389 (SUMITOMO METAL IND) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0002]-[0020] and figure 4. *; | [A]JP2014040502 (KANSAI COKE & CHEMICALS) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0002]-[0013] and figure 3. * |