EP3714474 - SWITCHING DEVICE FOR CONDUCTING AND DISCONNECTING ELECTRIC CURRENTS AND SWITCHING APPARATUS WITH SUCH A SWITCHING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/40] | SWITCHING APPARATUS FOR CARRYING AND DISCONNECTING ELECTRIC CURRENTS, AND SWITCHGEAR HAVING A SWITCHING APPARATUS OF THIS KIND | ||
[2024/13] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eaton Intelligent Power Limited 30 Pembroke Road Dublin 4 / IE | [2024/32] |
Former [2020/40] | For all designated states Eaton Intelligent Power Limited 30 Pembroke Road Dublin 4 / IE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEISSNER, Johannes Naheweg 2 53129 Bonn / DE | 02 /
SCHMITZ, Gerd Schlesierstrasse 95 53859 Niederkassel / DE | 03 /
SCHROEDER, Kai Thelengasse 69 53859 Niederkassel / DE | 04 /
WOHLANG, Michael Bahnhofstrasse 29 53332 Bornheim / DE | 05 /
KREFT, Oliver Landsbergerstrasse 34 53119 Bonn / DE | 06 /
UEDELHOVEN, Marcel Zollstock 1 53945 Blankenheim / DE | [2020/40] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [2024/32] |
Former [2020/40] | Eaton IP Group EMEA c/o Eaton Industries Manufacturing GmbH Route de la Longeraie 7 1110 Morges / CH | Application number, filing date | 18807296.1 | 20.11.2018 | [2020/40] | WO2018EP81941 | Priority number, date | DE201710127886 | 24.11.2017 Original published format: DE102017127886 | [2020/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019101744 | Date: | 31.05.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3714474 | Date: | 30.09.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3714474 | Date: | 07.08.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01H33/59, H01H9/54 | [2020/40] | CPC: |
H01H33/596 (EP);
H01H9/542 (EP,US);
H01H33/59 (US);
H01H9/30 (US);
H03K17/56 (US);
H01H2009/546 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHALTVORRICHTUNG ZUM FÜHREN UND TRENNEN VON ELEKTRISCHEN STRÖMEN UND SCHALTGERÄT MIT EINER DERARTIGEN SCHALTVORRICHTUNG | [2020/40] | English: | SWITCHING DEVICE FOR CONDUCTING AND DISCONNECTING ELECTRIC CURRENTS AND SWITCHING APPARATUS WITH SUCH A SWITCHING DEVICE | [2024/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMUTATION POUR CONDUIRE ET DECONNECTER DES COURANTS ELECTRIQUES ET APPAREIL DE COMMUTATION AVEC UN TEL DISPOSITIF DE COMMUTATION | [2024/13] |
Former [2020/40] | SWITCHING APPARATUS FOR CARRYING AND DISCONNECTING ELECTRIC CURRENTS, AND SWITCHGEAR HAVING A SWITCHING APPARATUS OF THIS KIND | ||
Former [2020/40] | DISPOSITIF DE COMMUTATION POUR TRANSPORTER ET COUPER DES COURANTS ÉLECTRIQUES ET APPAREIL DE COMMUTATION COMPRENANT UN TEL DISPOSITIF DE COMMUTATION | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/40] | 02.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0011958 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP [US]); | [X]EP0179982 (IBM [US]); | [A]EP3057117 (KOREA ELECTRO TECH RES INST [KR]); | [Y]WO2017174326 (EATON ELECTRICAL IP GMBH & CO [DE]) | Examination | US4420784 | US2005212497 | by applicant | US4420784 | DE102013114259 | DE102016106414 | DE102016108246 |