EP3612854 - VEHICLE NAVIGATION SYSTEM USING POSE ESTIMATION BASED ON POINT CLOUD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.12.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.01.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Didi Infinity Technology and Development Co., Ltd. Building 34 No. 8 Dongbeiwang West Road Haidian District Beijing 100193 / CN | [2020/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Sheng Building 34, No.8 Dongbeiwang West Road Haidian District Beijing 100193 / CN | 02 /
MA, Teng Room 201, 2/F, Building 3 No. 29 Dongbeiwang South Road Haidian District Beijing 100193 / CN | 03 /
NIAN, Xing Room 201, 2/F, Building 3 No.29 Dongbeiwang South Road Haidian District Beijing 100193 / CN | [2020/09] | Representative(s) | Wang, Bo Panovision IP Ebersberger Straße 3 85570 Markt Schwaben / DE | [2020/09] | Application number, filing date | 18807549.3 | 02.07.2018 | [2020/09] | WO2018CN94118 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020006667 | Date: | 09.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3612854 | Date: | 26.02.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3612854 | Date: | 15.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 09.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01S17/89, G01S7/481, G01S17/86, G01S17/931, G01S17/875 | [2023/01] | CPC: |
G01S7/4817 (EP);
G01S7/4808 (US);
G01S17/42 (US);
G01S17/86 (EP);
G01S17/875 (EP);
G01S17/89 (EP);
G01S17/931 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/09] | G01S7/48, G01S17/93, G01S17/89, G01S7/481, G01S19/38, G01S17/02, G01S17/87, G01S5/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGNAVIGATIONSSYSTEM MIT POSITIONSSCHÄTZUNG AUF DER BASIS EINER PUNKTWOLKE | [2020/09] | English: | VEHICLE NAVIGATION SYSTEM USING POSE ESTIMATION BASED ON POINT CLOUD | [2020/09] | French: | SYSTÈME DE NAVIGATION DE VÉHICULE UTILISANT UNE ESTIMATION DE POSE FONDÉE SUR UN NUAGE DE POINTS | [2020/09] | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.2018 | Search fee paid | 05.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.2018 | Examination requested [2020/09] | 15.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 18.12.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.03.2023 | CZ | 15.03.2023 | DK | 15.03.2023 | EE | 15.03.2023 | ES | 15.03.2023 | FI | 15.03.2023 | HR | 15.03.2023 | IT | 15.03.2023 | LT | 15.03.2023 | LV | 15.03.2023 | MC | 15.03.2023 | NL | 15.03.2023 | PL | 15.03.2023 | RO | 15.03.2023 | RS | 15.03.2023 | SE | 15.03.2023 | SI | 15.03.2023 | SK | 15.03.2023 | SM | 15.03.2023 | NO | 15.06.2023 | GR | 16.06.2023 | IE | 02.07.2023 | LU | 02.07.2023 | IS | 15.07.2023 | PT | 17.07.2023 | BE | 31.07.2023 | CH | 31.07.2023 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
CZ | 15.03.2023 | ||
DK | 15.03.2023 | ||
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
MC | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
PL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SI | 15.03.2023 | ||
SK | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
LU | 02.07.2023 | ||
IS | 15.07.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
BE | 31.07.2023 | ||
CH | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
CZ | 15.03.2023 | ||
DK | 15.03.2023 | ||
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
MC | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
PL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SI | 15.03.2023 | ||
SK | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
LU | 02.07.2023 | ||
IS | 15.07.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
BE | 31.07.2023 | ||
CH | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/18] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
CZ | 15.03.2023 | ||
DK | 15.03.2023 | ||
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
MC | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
PL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SI | 15.03.2023 | ||
SK | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
LU | 02.07.2023 | ||
IS | 15.07.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/14] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
CZ | 15.03.2023 | ||
DK | 15.03.2023 | ||
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
MC | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
PL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SI | 15.03.2023 | ||
SK | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
IS | 15.07.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
CZ | 15.03.2023 | ||
DK | 15.03.2023 | ||
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
PL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SI | 15.03.2023 | ||
SK | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
IS | 15.07.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
CZ | 15.03.2023 | ||
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
PL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SK | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
IS | 15.07.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
CZ | 15.03.2023 | ||
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RO | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
ES | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 15.03.2023 | |
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
PT | 17.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | FI | 15.03.2023 | |
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
NL | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | FI | 15.03.2023 | |
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
GR | 16.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | FI | 15.03.2023 | |
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 15.03.2023 | |
LT | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 15.03.2023 | |
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 15.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2010106356 (TREPAGNIER PAUL GERARD [US], et al) [X] 1,2,8,9,15 * figure 4B * * abstract * * paragraphs [0046] , [0074] , [0106] , [0159] * [I] 3-7,10-14; | [XI]WO2013045917 (UNIV OXFORD [GB]) [X] 1,2,8,9,15 * figures 1,4 * * abstract * * page 3, line 12 - page 4, line 3 * * page 10, line 13 - page 11, line 7 * [I] 3-7,10-14; | [I]WO2015173034 (TOMTOM GLOBAL CONTENT BV [NL]) [I] 1-15 * figures 3,13 * * abstract * * page 2, line 28 - line 32 ** page 11, line 8 - line 9 * | International search | [A]CN105279371 (WUHAN HI CLOUD TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]CN105783873 (TENCENT TECH SHENZHEN CO LTD ) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]CN106225790 (BAIDU ONLINE NETWORK TECHNOLOGY BEIJING CO LTD ) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]CN106908775 (UNIV TONGJI) [A] 1-20 * description, paragraphs[0012]-[0015], figure4 *; | [A]US2018088234 (SCHERER SEBASTIAN [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A] - HAN, MINGRUI et al., "3D localization and mapping of outdoor mobile robots using a LIDAR", Natural Science Edition, (20151031), vol. 43, ISSN 1671-4512, pages 315 - 318, XP009515594 [A] 1-20 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.13245/j.hust.15S1075 | by applicant | US2010106356 | WO2013045917 | WO2015173034 |