EP3710752 - FOOD PREPARATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.07.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.05.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2020/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRANCO GUTIERREZ, Carlos C/ Celso Ferreiro nº8 5ºD 50017 Zaragoza / ES | 02 /
MARZO ALVAREZ, Teresa Del Carmen C/ Gran Via 31, 5 izda 50006 Zaragoza / ES | 03 /
PAESA GARCIA, David Sauce 15 50015 Zaragoza / ES | 04 /
PARRA BORDERÍAS, Maria C/Santa Teresa de Jesús nº 54 entlo.izda. 50006 Zaragoza / ES | 05 /
RODRIGUEZ LARROSA, Agostina Lagos de Corona 16, casa 1, 6 b 50011 Zaragoza / ES | 06 /
VILLANUEVA VALERO, Beatriz C/Pascual Lorenz Sebastián nº5 2ºA 50011 Zaragoza / ES | [2023/02] |
Former [2020/39] | 01 /
FRANCO GUTIERREZ, Carlos C/ Celso Ferreiro nº8 5ºD 50017 Zaragoza / ES | ||
02 /
MARZO ALVAREZ, Teresa Del Carmen Ludwig Van Beethoven 74 4º C Rosales del Canal 50012 Zaragoza / ES | |||
03 /
PAESA GARCIA, David Sauce 15 50015 Zaragoza / ES | |||
04 /
PARRA BORDERÍAS, Maria C/Santa Teresa de Jesús nº 54 entlo.izda. 50006 Zaragoza / ES | |||
05 /
RODRIGUEZ LARROSA, Agostina P/ Lagos de Alba 15 50011 Zaragoza / ES | |||
06 /
VILLANUEVA VALERO, Beatriz C/Pascual Lorenz Sebastián nº5 2ºA 50011 Zaragoza / ES | Application number, filing date | 18807715.0 | 09.11.2018 | [2020/39] | WO2018IB58821 | Priority number, date | ES20170031327 | 15.11.2017 Original published format: ES 201731327 | [2020/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019097375 | Date: | 23.05.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3710752 | Date: | 23.09.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3710752 | Date: | 11.01.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F24C7/08 | [2020/39] | CPC: |
F24C7/08 (EP);
G05B15/02 (ES)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LEBENSMITTELZUBEREITUNGSSYSTEM | [2020/39] | English: | FOOD PREPARATION SYSTEM | [2020/39] | French: | SYSTÈME DE PRÉPARATION D'ALIMENT | [2020/39] | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 15.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/39] | 15.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 29.06.2022 | 29.06.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 29.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.10.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.10.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 11.01.2023 | DK | 11.01.2023 | EE | 11.01.2023 | FI | 11.01.2023 | HR | 11.01.2023 | IT | 11.01.2023 | LT | 11.01.2023 | LV | 11.01.2023 | PL | 11.01.2023 | RO | 11.01.2023 | RS | 11.01.2023 | SE | 11.01.2023 | SI | 11.01.2023 | SK | 11.01.2023 | SM | 11.01.2023 | NO | 11.04.2023 | GR | 12.04.2023 | IS | 11.05.2023 | PT | 11.05.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/11] | CZ | 11.01.2023 | |
DK | 11.01.2023 | ||
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RO | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
SI | 11.01.2023 | ||
SK | 11.01.2023 | ||
SM | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | CZ | 11.01.2023 | |
DK | 11.01.2023 | ||
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RO | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
SK | 11.01.2023 | ||
SM | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | CZ | 11.01.2023 | |
DK | 11.01.2023 | ||
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RO | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
SM | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | DK | 11.01.2023 | |
EE | 11.01.2023 | ||
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
SM | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | DK | 11.01.2023 | |
FI | 11.01.2023 | ||
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
SM | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | FI | 11.01.2023 | |
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IS | 11.05.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | FI | 11.01.2023 | |
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
PL | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | FI | 11.01.2023 | |
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
GR | 12.04.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | FI | 11.01.2023 | |
HR | 11.01.2023 | ||
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
LV | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
SE | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 11.01.2023 | |
LT | 11.01.2023 | ||
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
NO | 11.04.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 11.01.2023 | |
RS | 11.01.2023 | ||
PT | 11.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 11.01.2023 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1882886 (ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS N V [BE]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0037] - [0040] *; | [X]US2009259689 (DO LYDIA MAI [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0109]; figure 10 *; | [A]US2014263640 (HEIT RYDER C [US], et al) [A] 1* paragraph [0068] *; | [XY]WO2015135031 (MLC CORP PTY LTD [AU]) [X] 1,3,4,11,12 * paragraphs [0027] - [0029]; figure 1 * [Y] 10; | [A]EP2989940 (VORWERK CO INTERHOLDING [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]US2016081515 (ABOUJASSOUM KHALID [QA], et al) [X] 1,2,6-9,12 * paragraphs [0044] , [0073] , [0087]; figures 6a,23 *; | [X]DE102015103380 (STEPPON ERNST-WILFRIED [NL]) [X] 1,2,4,5,11,12 * paragraphs [0008] , [0009] , [0025] , [0026] *; | [Y] - N N, "Beantwortet - - Schritte überspringen beim TM 5", (20161017), URL: https://www.wunderkessel.de/t/schritte-ueberspringen-beim-tm-5.120994/, (20190124), XP055547149 [Y] 10 * the whole document * | Examination | DE102009000652 | DE102010039072 |