EP3877431 - ETHYLENE-ALPHA-OLEFIN-NONCONJUGATED POLYENE COPOLYMER RUBBER AND RUBBER COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.11.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.05.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.12.2021 [2021/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY, LIMITED 27-1, Shinkawa 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 1048260 / JP | [2021/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUJII, Yohei c/o SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY, LIMITED, 5-1, Anesaki-Kaigan Ichihara-shi, Chiba 299-0195 / JP | 02 /
NAKANO, Sadayuki c/o SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY, LIMITED, 5-1, Anesaki-Kaigan Ichihara-shi, Chiba 299-0195 / JP | [2021/37] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [2021/37] | Application number, filing date | 18807728.3 | 07.11.2018 | [2021/37] | WO2018JP41392 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020095395 | Date: | 14.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3877431 | Date: | 15.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C08F210/04, C08F10/04 | [2021/37] | CPC: |
C08F255/06 (EP);
C08F210/18 (US)
| C-Set: |
C08F210/18, C08F4/005 (EP);
C08F210/18, C08F4/68 (EP);
C08F255/06, C08F210/18 (EP);
C08F210/18, C08F2500/17 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ETHYLEN-ALPHA-OLEFIN-NICHTKONJUGIERTES POLYEN-COPOLYMERKAUTSCHUK UND KAUTSCHUKZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2021/37] | English: | ETHYLENE-ALPHA-OLEFIN-NONCONJUGATED POLYENE COPOLYMER RUBBER AND RUBBER COMPOSITION | [2021/37] | French: | CAOUTCHOUC DE COPOLYMÈRE DE POLYÈNE NON CONJUGUÉ D'ÉTHYLÈNE-ALPHA-OLÉFINE ET COMPOSITION DE CAOUTCHOUC | [2021/37] | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/37] | 29.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.11.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2014316091 (NAKANO SADAYUKI [JP]) [X] 1-3 * example 1 *; | [X]EP0896982 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC [JP]) [X] 1-3 * example 1; table 1 *; | [X]WO9900434 (DSM NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-3 * table 2 *; | [X]US4259468 (KAJIURA HIROKAZU, et al) [X] 1-3 * table 2 *; | [X]JP2011174003 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [066 ] - [0 67] *; | [A]EP1217015 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC [JP]) [A] 1-3 * examples 1-4; table 1 *; | [A]EP1088836 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC [JP]) [A] 1-3 * examples 1-5; table 1 *; | [A]EP3125233 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC [JP]) [A] 1-3 * paragraphs [0081] , [0 83] * | by applicant | JP2003040934 | - USAMI, Characterization of polyethylene by infrared absorption spectrum by Takayama | - MC RAE, M. A.; MADDAM S, W. F., Makromolekulare Chemie, (19760000), vol. 177, page 461 |