EP3884582 - END-TO-END LEARNING IN COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.03.2024 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.02.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.12.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.05.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2021/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOYDIS, Jakob 47 Rue Sarrette 75014 Paris / FR | 02 /
AIT AOUDIA, Faycal 3 Parc de la Bérengère 92210 Saint-Cloud / FR | [2021/39] | Representative(s) | Whiting, Gary, et al Venner Shipley LLP 5 Stirling House Stirling Road The Surrey Research Park Guildford GU2 7RF / GB | [2021/39] | Application number, filing date | 18808005.5 | 23.11.2018 | [2021/39] | WO2018EP82454 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020104045 | Date: | 28.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3884582 | Date: | 29.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/00, G06N3/04, H04B1/40 | [2021/39] | CPC: |
H04B1/40 (EP,US);
H04B1/0003 (EP,US);
G06N3/045 (EP,US);
G06N3/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/39] | Title | German: | END-TO-END-LERNEN IN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEMEN | [2021/39] | English: | END-TO-END LEARNING IN COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS | [2021/39] | French: | APPRENTISSAGE DE BOUT EN BOUT DANS DES SYSTÈMES DE COMMUNICATION | [2021/39] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/39] | 18.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 18.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [IA] - SEBASTIAN D\"ORNER ET AL, "Deep Learning-Based Communication Over the Air", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20170711), doi:10.1109/JSTSP.2017.2784180, XP081279898 [I] 1-4,7-20 * II. End-to-end learning of communication systems - IV. Results; page 2, column l - page 7, column l; figures 2, 3, 4,5 * [A] 5,6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JSTSP.2017.2784180 | [IA] - TIMOTHY J O'SHEA ET AL, "An Introduction to Machine Learning Communications Systems", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20170202), XP080746465 [I] 1-4,7-20 * II: Examples of machine learning applications for the physical layer - C. CNN's for classification needs; page 4, column l - page 7, column l; figures 1, 2, 5 * [A] 5,6 | [IA] - Timothy O'shea ET AL, "An Introduction to Deep Learning for the Physical Layer", IEEE Transactions on Cognitive Communications and Networking, doi:10.1109/TCCN.2017.2758370, (20171201), pages 563 - 575, URL: https://arxiv.org/pdf/1702.00832.pdf, XP055569291 [I] 1-4,7-20 * III. Examples of machine learning applications for hte physical layer.; page 4, column r - page 6, column l; figures 1-4 * [A] 5,6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCCN.2017.2758370 |