EP3700715 - EXOSKELETON STRUCTURE ADAPTED TO THE SHOULDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2022 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.09.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.05.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Safran Electronics & Defense 18/20 Quai du Point du Jour 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | For all designated states B-Temia Inc. 4780 St-Félix Street Suite 105 St-Augustin-de-Desmaures, QC G3A 2J9 / CA | [2020/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZOSO, Nathaniel 12320 rue du Glorieux Quebec Quebec G2A 3E8 / CA | 02 /
GRENIER, Jordane c/o Safran Electronics & Defense 18/20 Quai du Point du Jour 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [2020/36] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2020/36] | Application number, filing date | 18808426.3 | 24.10.2018 | [2020/36] | WO2018FR52642 | Priority number, date | FR20170060027 | 24.10.2017 Original published format: FR 1760027 | [2020/36] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019081851 | Date: | 02.05.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3700715 | Date: | 02.09.2020 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3700715 | Date: | 13.10.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B25J9/00 | [2020/36] | CPC: |
B25J9/0006 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61H1/0281 (IL,US);
B25J17/0283 (IL,US);
B25J9/0009 (IL,KR);
B25J9/106 (IL,KR);
B25J9/126 (IL,US);
A61H2001/0203 (IL,US);
A61H2201/1215 (IL,US);
A61H2201/14 (IL,US);
A61H2201/1626 (IL,US);
A61H2201/1638 (IL,US);
A61H2201/165 (IL,US);
A61H2201/1673 (IL,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AN DIE SCHULTER ANGEPASSTE EXOSKELETTSTRUKTUR | [2020/36] | English: | EXOSKELETON STRUCTURE ADAPTED TO THE SHOULDER | [2020/36] | French: | STRUCTURE D'EXOSQUELETTE ADAPTE A L'EPAULE | [2020/36] | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/36] | 20.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.09.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.07.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.10.2018 | AL | 13.10.2021 | AT | 13.10.2021 | CY | 13.10.2021 | CZ | 13.10.2021 | DK | 13.10.2021 | EE | 13.10.2021 | HR | 13.10.2021 | LT | 13.10.2021 | LV | 13.10.2021 | MC | 13.10.2021 | MK | 13.10.2021 | PL | 13.10.2021 | RO | 13.10.2021 | RS | 13.10.2021 | SI | 13.10.2021 | SK | 13.10.2021 | SM | 13.10.2021 | TR | 13.10.2021 | IE | 24.10.2021 | LU | 24.10.2021 | BE | 31.10.2021 | BG | 13.01.2022 | GR | 14.01.2022 | IS | 13.02.2022 | PT | 14.02.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 24.10.2018 | |
AL | 13.10.2021 | ||
AT | 13.10.2021 | ||
CY | 13.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
DK | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
MK | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SI | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
IE | 24.10.2021 | ||
LU | 24.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 24.10.2018 | |
AL | 13.10.2021 | ||
AT | 13.10.2021 | ||
CY | 13.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
DK | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SI | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
IE | 24.10.2021 | ||
LU | 24.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 13.10.2021 | |
AT | 13.10.2021 | ||
CY | 13.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
DK | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SI | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
IE | 24.10.2021 | ||
LU | 24.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 13.10.2021 | |
AT | 13.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
DK | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SI | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
IE | 24.10.2021 | ||
LU | 24.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 13.10.2021 | |
AT | 13.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
DK | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
IE | 24.10.2021 | ||
LU | 24.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
DK | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
IE | 24.10.2021 | ||
LU | 24.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
DK | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
LU | 24.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 13.01.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2007225620 (CARIGNAN CRAIG R [US], et al) [A] 1-13* figure 10 *; | [A]JP5169469B (UNIV OF SCIENCE TOKYO) [A] 1-13 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP3156193 (CYBERDYNE INC [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0021] - [0042] * * figure 2 *; | [A]FR3046052 (SAGEM DEFENSE SECURITE [FR], et al) [A] 1-13 * page 22, line 12 - page 25, line 3 * * figures 16,17 * |