EP3710810 - SAMPLE CARRIER FOR OPTICAL MEASUREMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.05.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states S.D. Sight Diagnostics Ltd. 23 Menachem Begin Rd, Floor 15 6618356 Tel Aviv / IL | [2020/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YORAV-RAPHAEL, Noam Techelet Mordechay 806/4 9090800 Tekoa / IL | 02 /
POLLAK, Joseph Joel 8 Migdal Eder street 9090900 Neve Daniel / IL | 03 /
LEVY SCHREIER, Sarah 10 Hisin Street 6428412 Tel Aviv / IL | 04 /
ESHEL, Yochay Shlomo 2 Hadekel Street 4493500 Sde Warburg / IL | [2020/39] | Representative(s) | Evens, Paul Jonathan, et al Maguire Boss 24 East Street St. Ives, Cambridgeshire PE27 5PD / GB | [2020/39] | Application number, filing date | 18808508.8 | 12.11.2018 | [2020/39] | WO2018IB58861 | Priority number, date | US201762585621P | 14.11.2017 Original published format: US 201762585621 P | [2020/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019097387 | Date: | 23.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3710810 | Date: | 23.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3710810 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/03, B01L3/00, G01N21/64, G01N35/00, // B01L9/00 | [2023/16] | CPC: |
G01N21/6456 (EP,US);
G02B21/0076 (US);
B01L3/5027 (EP);
G01N21/03 (EP);
G02B21/36 (US);
B01L2200/0689 (EP);
B01L2300/0822 (EP);
B01L2300/0877 (EP);
B01L2300/0887 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/39] | G01N21/03, B01L3/00, G01N21/64, G01N35/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PROBENTRÄGER FÜR OPTISCHE MESSUNGEN | [2020/39] | English: | SAMPLE CARRIER FOR OPTICAL MEASUREMENTS | [2020/39] | French: | PORTE-ÉCHANTILLON POUR MESURES OPTIQUES | [2020/39] | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/39] | 04.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Licence(s) | ID: | 01 00/exclusive | For: | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR | Licencee: | IDEXX LABORATORIES, INC. One IDEXX Drive Westbrook, Maine 04092 / US | Date: | 22.12.2022 | [2023/13] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.09.2023 | CZ | 06.09.2023 | DK | 06.09.2023 | EE | 06.09.2023 | ES | 06.09.2023 | FI | 06.09.2023 | HR | 06.09.2023 | IT | 06.09.2023 | LT | 06.09.2023 | LV | 06.09.2023 | MC | 06.09.2023 | NL | 06.09.2023 | PL | 06.09.2023 | RO | 06.09.2023 | RS | 06.09.2023 | SE | 06.09.2023 | SI | 06.09.2023 | SK | 06.09.2023 | SM | 06.09.2023 | LU | 12.11.2023 | CH | 30.11.2023 | NO | 06.12.2023 | GR | 07.12.2023 | IS | 06.01.2024 | PT | 08.01.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
DK | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
MC | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
LU | 12.11.2023 | ||
CH | 30.11.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
DK | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
MC | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
MC | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 06.09.2023 | |
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4580895 (PATEL SHAILEN S [US]) [A] 1-3,10-14,21-23,25 * abstract; col. 3, lines 32-37;; figures 1,2 *; | [XI]US6027695 (OLDENBURG KEVIN R [US], et al) [X] 1,10-12,14,21,22 * abstract; col. 1, lines 36-45; col. 4, lines 46-57; col. 5, lines 33-60; col. 8, line 43, to col. 9, line 2;; figure 1 * [I] 2,13,23,25; | [A]WO03081525 (ENDRESS & HAUSER WETZER GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1,12,23,25* abstract *; | [XI]US2010152054 (LOVE J CHRISTOPHER [US], et al) [X] 1,3,10-12,14,21,22 * paragraphs [0074] , [0075] , [0124]; figures 1C, 1D * [I] 2,13,23,25; | [A] - AIGARS PIRUSKA ET AL, "The autofluorescence of plastic materials and chips measured under laser irradiation", LAB ON A CHIP, (20051101), vol. 5, no. 12, doi:10.1039/b508288a, ISSN 1473-0197, pages 1348 - 1354, XP055546747 [A] 1-3,10-14,21-23,25 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b508288a | by applicant | US2012169863 | US2014347459 | US2015037806 | US2015316477 | WO2016030897 | US2016208306 | US2016246046 | US2016279633 | WO2017046799 | WO2017168411 | WO2017195205 | WO2017195208 | US2018246313 |