EP3633529 - SYSTEMC MODEL GENERATION METHOD AND SYSTEMC MODEL GENERATION PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.06.2021 [2021/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2020/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMASHITA, Hiroaki c/o Fujitsu Kyushu Network Technologies Limited 2-1 momochihama 2-chome sawara-ku fukuoka-shi Fukuoka 814-8588 / JP | 02 /
IMAZATO, Kenichi c/o Fujitsu Kyushu Network Technologies Limited 2-1 momochihama 2-chome sawara-ku fukuoka-shi Fukuoka 814-8588 / JP | 03 /
TAMIYA, Yutaka c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1 Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2020/15] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2020/15] | Application number, filing date | 18809491.6 | 28.03.2018 | [2020/15] | WO2018JP12695 | Priority number, date | JP20170105814 | 29.05.2017 Original published format: JP 2017105814 | [2020/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018220974 | Date: | 06.12.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3633529 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.12.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06F30/323 | [2020/23] | CPC: |
G06F16/9027 (EP);
G06F30/327 (EP,US);
G06F16/903 (US);
G06F30/33 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2020/15] | G06F17/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/15] | Title | German: | SYSTEMMODELLERZEUGUNGSVERFAHREN UND SYSTEMMODELLERZEUGUNGSPROGRAMM | [2020/15] | English: | SYSTEMC MODEL GENERATION METHOD AND SYSTEMC MODEL GENERATION PROGRAM | [2020/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE GÉNÉRATION D'UN MODÈLE SYSTEMC ET PROGRAMME DE GÉNÉRATION D'UN MODÈLE SYSTEMC | [2020/15] | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.2019 | Translation filed | 23.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 23.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 23.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/15] | 08.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/22] | 14.01.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - Gert Jan Schoneveld, "VHDL to SystemC: The Design of a Translator", (20090827), URL: https://repository.tudelft.nl/islandora/object/uuid%3Af2ecf719-d8d4-4197-be07-1822e84f6968, (20200424), XP055689141 [X] 1-5,10,12-15 * abstract * * pages 23-27; figure 3.1. * [I] 6-9,11 | [XI] - YUN-HUNG LIAW ET AL, "V2X: An Automated Tool for Building SystemC-Based Simulation Environments in Designing Multicore Systems-on-Chips", PARALLEL AND DISTRIBUTED PROCESSING WITH APPLICATIONS (ISPA), 2010 INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20100906), ISBN 978-1-4244-8095-1, pages 413 - 418, XP031800413 [X] 1-5,10,12-15 * abstract * * section III. * [I] 6-9,11 | [A] - BOMBANA M ET AL, "SystemC-VHDL Co-simulation and synthesis in the HW domain", DESIGN, AUTOMATION, AND TEST IN EUROPE CONFERENCE AND EXHIBITION. PROCEEDINGS, IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY, US, (20030303), ISSN 1530-1591, ISBN 978-0-7695-2288-3, pages 101 - 105, XP010674170 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * section 2.;; figure 1 * | [A] - Chris Fletcher, "Verilog: always @ Blocks", (20090827), URL: https://inst.eecs.berkeley.edu/~eecs151/fa19/files/verilog/always_at_blocks.pdf, (20200424), XP055689277 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JP2007087215 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-16 * , paragraphs [0014]-[0027], [0065] & US 2007/0067751 A1, paragraphs [0119]-[0132], [0189]-[0209] *; | [A]JP2008077330 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1-16 * , paragraphs [0005]-[0040] & US 2008/0071514 A1, paragraphs [0008]-[0056] *; | [A] - TATSUOKA, MASATO et al., "Function Code Extraction from RTL Property for Reuse", IEICE technical report, (20140224), vol. 113, no. 454, ISSN 0913-5685, pages 171 - 176, XP055640838 [A] 1-16 | by applicant | JP2013020329 |