EP3632327 - ROUTE SELECTION ASSIST SYSTEM, RECORDING MEDIUM FOR RECORDING ROUTE SELECTION ASSIST PROGRAM, ROUTE SELECTION ASSIST METHOD, AND DIAGNOSIS METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.03.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Terumo Kabushiki Kaisha 44-1 Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | [2020/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAHASHI, Haruhiko c/o TERUMO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 49th Floor, Tokyo Opera City Tower 20-2-3-chome, Nishi-Shinjuku Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-1450 / JP | 02 /
SEKINE, Yusuke c/o TERUMO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1500 Inokuchi Nakai-machi Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa 259-0151 / JP | 03 /
FUKUOKA, Tetsuya c/o TERUMO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1500 Inokuchi Nakai-machi Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa 259-0151 / JP | [2020/15] | Representative(s) | Casalonga Casalonga & Partners Bayerstraße 71/73 80335 München / DE | [2020/15] | Application number, filing date | 18810086.1 | 29.05.2018 | [2020/15] | WO2018JP20531 | Priority number, date | JP20170110379 | 02.06.2017 Original published format: JP 2017110379 | [2020/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018221509 | Date: | 06.12.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3632327 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.12.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/03, A61B6/00, A61M25/06, A61B17/00, A61B34/10, // A61B34/00 | [2021/10] | CPC: |
A61B34/10 (EP,US);
A61B1/00009 (US);
A61B1/000096 (EP,US);
A61B5/02007 (US);
A61B6/00 (EP);
A61B6/03 (EP);
A61B90/36 (US);
A61M25/06 (EP);
G06T19/003 (US);
A61B2017/00778 (EP);
A61B2034/104 (EP,US);
A61B2034/105 (EP,US);
A61B2034/107 (EP,US);
A61B2034/256 (EP);
A61B2090/3735 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/15] | A61B6/03, A61B6/00, A61B17/12, A61M25/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/15] | Title | German: | ROUTENAUSWAHLUNTERSTÜTZUNGSSYSTEM, AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM ZUR AUFZEICHNUNG EINES ROUTENAUSWAHLUNTERSTÜTZUNGSPROGRAMMS, ROUTENAUSWAHLUNTERSTÜTZUNGSVERFAHREN UND DIAGNOSEVERFAHREN | [2020/15] | English: | ROUTE SELECTION ASSIST SYSTEM, RECORDING MEDIUM FOR RECORDING ROUTE SELECTION ASSIST PROGRAM, ROUTE SELECTION ASSIST METHOD, AND DIAGNOSIS METHOD | [2020/15] | French: | SYSTÈME D'AIDE À LA SÉLECTION D'ITINÉRAIRE, SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT DESTINÉ À ENREGISTRER UN PROGRAMME D'AIDE À LA SÉLECTION D'ITINÉRAIRE, PROCÉDÉ D'AIDE À LA SÉLECTION D'ITINÉRAIRE ET MÉTHODE DE DIAGNOSTIC | [2020/15] | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.2019 | Translation filed | 07.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.2019 | Search fee paid | 07.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/15] | 23.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2008097165 (GATTANI ABHISHEK [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7-10 * claim 1 * * paragraphs [0009] - [0011] - [0 65] , [0 66] , [0 68] , [0 69] , [0 83] , [0 84] , [0 86] - [0090] * * figures 4, 16 * [I] 4; | [A]US2008183073 (HIGGINS WILLIAM E [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US2015119966 (RICHTER SERGIO [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [XI]US2015282887 (YAMADA KENTA [JP]) [X] 1,6,8-10 * figures 2, 3, 7 * * paragraphs [0040] , [0 42] , [0 44] , [0 47] , [0 49] , [0 74] - [0076] - [0 81] , [0 88] - [0091] * [I] 4; | [A]US2016106512 (BIFFI MAURO [IT], et al) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [A]WO2016083927 (SYNAPTIVE MEDICAL BARBADOS INC [BB], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JP2000113086 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO) [A] 4-6 * , *; | [Y]JP2009511155 [Y] 2 * , *; | [A]JP2010517633 [A] 4-6* , *; | [Y]JP2012200403 (FUJIFILM CORP) [Y] 7 * , *; | [XY]JP2014124218 (FUJIFILM CORP) [X] 1, 3, 8-10 * , * [Y] 2, 7 | by applicant | JP2014230710 | JP2017110379 |