EP3887658 - AN AFTERTREATMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.06.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VOLVO TRUCK CORPORATION 405 08 Göteborg / SE | [2021/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDERSSON, Lennart Torpavägen 58 432 95 Varberg / SE | 02 /
SHWAN, Soran Norra Nedanvägen 6 G 431 62 Mölndal / SE | 03 /
MAGNUSSSON, Mathias Nedre Matrosgatan 3 413 15 Göteborg / SE | [2021/40] | Representative(s) | Kransell & Wennborg KB P.O. Box 2096 403 12 Göteborg / SE | [2021/40] | Application number, filing date | 18810988.8 | 26.11.2018 | [2021/40] | WO2018EP82534 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020108725 | Date: | 04.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3887658 | Date: | 06.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3887658 | Date: | 23.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/20, F01N13/00 | [2021/40] | CPC: |
F01N3/2066 (EP);
F01N3/208 (US);
B01D53/9431 (US);
B01D53/944 (US);
B01D53/9468 (US);
B01D53/9477 (US);
B01D53/9495 (US);
F01N13/0093 (EP,US);
F01N3/106 (EP,US);
F01N3/2053 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20707 (US);
B01D2255/2092 (US);
B01D2255/50 (US);
F01N2410/00 (US);
F01N2410/02 (EP);
F01N2410/03 (EP);
F01N2610/02 (EP);
F01N2610/11 (US);
F01N2900/08 (US);
F01N2900/1602 (US);
Y02A50/20 (EP);
Y02T10/12 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NACHBEHANDLUNGSSYSTEM | [2021/40] | English: | AN AFTERTREATMENT SYSTEM | [2021/40] | French: | SYSTÈME DE POST-TRAITEMENT | [2021/40] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/40] | 25.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2021 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   11.01.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 23.08.2023 | ES | 23.08.2023 | HR | 23.08.2023 | MC | 23.08.2023 | PL | 23.08.2023 | RO | 23.08.2023 | RS | 23.08.2023 | SK | 23.08.2023 | SM | 23.08.2023 | NO | 23.11.2023 | GR | 24.11.2023 | CH | 30.11.2023 | IS | 23.12.2023 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/32] | CZ | 23.08.2023 | |
ES | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
MC | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RO | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SK | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 23.08.2023 | |
ES | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RO | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SK | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HR | 23.08.2023 | |
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 23.08.2023 | |
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 23.11.2023 | |
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 23.11.2023 | |
GR | 24.11.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XYI]EP0916389 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,4,5,7-9,11,16,17,19 * paragraphs [0021] , [0042] - [0049]; figure 9 * [Y] 2,10,12-15,18 [I] 3,6,20-22; | [YA]US2011058999 (ETTIREDDY PADMANABHA REDDY [US], et al) [Y] 2,18 * paragraphs [0027] - [0036]; figure 1 * [A] 1,6,12,16; | [YA]DE102010014468 (UMICORE AG & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 12-15 * paragraphs [0026] , [0029] - [0037] - [0051] - [0057]; figure 1 * [A] 1,16; | [YA]EP2860366 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 10 * paragraphs [0010] , [0044]; figure 9 *[A] 12-15 |