EP3724117 - ELEVATOR CAR SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MOUNTING AN ELEVATOR CAR ROOF COMPRISING AT LEAST ONE TOE BOARD TO UPRIGHTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INVENTIO AG Seestrasse 55 6052 Hergiswil / CH | [2022/37] |
Former [2020/43] | For all designated states Inventio AG Seestrasse 55 6052 Hergiswil / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JAGDALE, Swapnil c/o Schindler India Pvt. Ltd. Corporate R&D India Plot no. D-234, Near village Warale, Chakan MIDC Phase-II Pune, Maharashtra 410501 / IN | 02 /
DEVTALE, Rahul c/o Schindler India Pvt. Ltd. Corporate R&D India Plot no. D-234, Near village Warale, Chakan MIDC Phase-II Pune, Maharashtra 410501 / IN | [2020/43] | Representative(s) | Inventio AG Seestrasse 55 6052 Hergiswil / CH | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 18811565.3 | 06.12.2018 | [2020/43] | WO2018EP83711 | Priority number, date | EP20170207014 | 13.12.2017 Original published format: EP 17207014 | [2020/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019115319 | Date: | 20.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3724117 | Date: | 21.10.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B66B11/02 | [2020/43] | CPC: |
B66B11/0226 (EP,US);
B66B11/0206 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/43] | Title | German: | AUFZUGKABINENSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR MONTAGE EINES AUFZUGKABINENDACHES MIT MINDESTENS EINEM BORDBRETT AN PFOSTEN | [2020/43] | English: | ELEVATOR CAR SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MOUNTING AN ELEVATOR CAR ROOF COMPRISING AT LEAST ONE TOE BOARD TO UPRIGHTS | [2020/43] | French: | SYSTÈME DE CABINE D'ASCENSEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE MONTAGE D'UN TOIT DE CABINE D'ASCENSEUR COMPRENANT AU MOINS UNE PLINTHE AU NIVEAU DE MONTANTS | [2020/43] | Entry into regional phase | 03.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 03.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/43] | 03.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE8528810U (ALBERT BÖCKER GMBH) [A] 1-9* abstract *; | [XA]AU599118B (OTIS ELEVATOR CO) [X] 1-4,6-9 * abstract * [A] 5; | [A]WO9839242 (INVENTIO AG [CH]) [A] 1-9 * abstract *; | [A]US2017137261 (MARUYAMA NAOYUKI [JP]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * |