EP3714115 - DEVICE FOR STRENGTHENING AND RIGGING TRUSSES AND METHOD IN WHICH SUCH DEVICE IS APPLIED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.12.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.05.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bruyninckx, Willy Vorstheide 47 2230 Herselt / BE | [2020/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2020/40] | Representative(s) | Van hunsel, Lieven M.S. Archimedes Patents Arenbergstraat 13 2000 Antwerpen / BE | [2020/40] | Application number, filing date | 18811657.8 | 14.11.2018 | [2020/40] | WO2018IB58945 | Priority number, date | BE20170005846 | 20.11.2017 Original published format: BE 201705846 | [2020/40] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019097415 | Date: | 23.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3714115 | Date: | 30.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3714115 | Date: | 22.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | E04C3/08, E04B1/24 | [2020/40] | CPC: |
E04C3/08 (EP);
F16M13/02 (US);
E04B1/19 (US);
E04C3/02 (US);
E04B2001/1927 (EP,US);
E04B2001/196 (EP,US);
E04B2001/1978 (EP);
E04B2001/2415 (EP);
E04B2001/2451 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERSTÄRKUNG UND TAKELUNG VON TRÄGERN UND VERFAHREN ZUR ANWENDUNG DIESER VORRICHTUNG | [2020/40] | English: | DEVICE FOR STRENGTHENING AND RIGGING TRUSSES AND METHOD IN WHICH SUCH DEVICE IS APPLIED | [2020/40] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RENFORCEMENT ET DE GRÉEMENT DE FERMES ET PROCÉDÉ DANS LEQUEL UN TEL DISPOSITIF EST APPLIQUÉ | [2020/40] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/40] | 09.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 22.03.2023 | DK | 22.03.2023 | EE | 22.03.2023 | FI | 22.03.2023 | HR | 22.03.2023 | LT | 22.03.2023 | LV | 22.03.2023 | MC | 22.03.2023 | PL | 22.03.2023 | RO | 22.03.2023 | RS | 22.03.2023 | SE | 22.03.2023 | SI | 22.03.2023 | SK | 22.03.2023 | SM | 22.03.2023 | NO | 22.06.2023 | GR | 23.06.2023 | IS | 22.07.2023 | PT | 24.07.2023 | [2024/32] |
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 22.03.2023 | |
DK | 22.03.2023 | ||
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
PL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SI | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | EE | 22.03.2023 | |
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
PL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | EE | 22.03.2023 | |
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | EE | 22.03.2023 | |
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | FI | 22.03.2023 | |
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | FI | 22.03.2023 | |
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | FI | 22.03.2023 | |
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 22.03.2023 | |
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 22.03.2023 | |
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 22.03.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5826384 (O'NEILL EDWARD L [US]) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [XA]DE19714996 (OCTANORM VERTRIEBS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,7-14 * abstract * [A] 4,6; | [A]US6079178 (FISHER MARK E [GB]) [A] 1,4 * abstract *; | [A]US6082068 (FISHER MARK E [GB]) [A] 1-14* abstract *; | [XA]EP1079039 (GOBERT M PATRICK [BE]) [X] 1-3,5,7-14 * abstract * [A] 4,6; | [XA]US8978338 (JOBIN PIERRE [CA], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7-14 * column 4, line 9 - column 7, line 27; figure - * [A] 4,6; | [XAI]FR3025539 (CHARLEC JEAN PAUL [FR]) [X] 1-3,5,7-14 * abstract * [A] 6 [I] 4 |