EP3706792 - MICRONEEDLE SYSTEM FOR APPLYING A HEPATITIS VACCINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.09.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.05.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG Lohmannstrasse 2 56626 Andernach / DE | [2020/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HENNING, Andreas Friedrich-Wilhelm-Raiffeisenstr. 1 72469 Meßstetten / DE | 02 /
SPILGIES, Heiko Elßholzstraße 20 10781 Berlin / DE | [2020/38] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/38] | Simandi, Claus Badehausallee 55 27476 Cuxhaven / DE | Application number, filing date | 18811721.2 | 12.11.2018 | [2020/38] | WO2018EP80986 | Priority number, date | DE201710126501 | 10.11.2017 Original published format: DE102017126501 | [2020/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019092257 | Date: | 16.05.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3706792 | Date: | 16.09.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/29, A61K9/00, A61P31/20, A61K39/12 | [2020/38] | CPC: |
A61K39/12 (EP);
A61K9/0021 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/29 (US);
A61K39/292 (EP,KR);
A61K47/10 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/26 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/32 (EP,KR,US);
A61M37/0015 (US);
A61P31/20 (EP,KR);
A61K2039/54 (KR);
A61M2037/0023 (US);
A61M2037/003 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/38] | Title | German: | MIKRONADELSYSTEM ZUR APPLIKATION EINES HEPATITIS-IMPFSTOFFES | [2020/38] | English: | MICRONEEDLE SYSTEM FOR APPLYING A HEPATITIS VACCINE | [2020/38] | French: | SYSTÈME DE MICROAIGUILLES POUR L'APPLICATION D'UN VACCIN CONTRE L'HÉPATITE | [2020/38] | Entry into regional phase | 10.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.09.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/38] | 10.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]JP2012041329 (KOSUMEDEI SEIYAKU KK, et al); | by applicant | WO0189622 | WO0219985 | DE10353629 | DE60131688T |