EP3720282 - METHOD FOR IMPROVING SEED GERMINATION AND/OR PLANT TOLERANCE TO ENVIRONMENTAL STRESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.07.2022 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Danstar Ferment AG Poststrasse 30 6300 Zug / CH | [2020/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COR, Olivier 24 bis rue du port à Girard 44640 Saint Jean de Boiseau / FR | [2020/42] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/42] | J A Kemp LLP 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 18811852.5 | 07.12.2018 | [2020/42] | WO2018EP84045 | Priority number, date | EP20170290158 | 07.12.2017 Original published format: EP 17290158 | [2020/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019110828 | Date: | 13.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3720282 | Date: | 14.10.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A01N37/44, A01P21/00 | [2020/42] | CPC: |
A01N37/44 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/42] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER SAMENKEIMUNG UND / ODER PFLANZENVERTRÄGLICHKEIT GEGENÜBER UMWELTBELASTUNG | [2020/42] | English: | METHOD FOR IMPROVING SEED GERMINATION AND/OR PLANT TOLERANCE TO ENVIRONMENTAL STRESS | [2020/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'AMÉLIORATION DE LA GERMINATION DE GRAINE ET/OU DE LA TOLÉRANCE D'UNE PLANTE AU STRESS ENVIRONNEMENTAL | [2020/42] | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/42] | 12.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XD]WO9535022 (COMMW SCIENT IND RES ORG [AU], et al) [XD] 22-31,41,42 * claims 1-10 * * tables 1-7 ** figures 1-17 *; | [XI]WO9614749 (TALL HOLDINGS PTY LTD AB [AU], et al) [X] 1,10,11,22-32 * claims 4-26 * * examples 1-2 * * page 21, paragraph l * [I] 1-42; | [XI]WO9641532 (CULTOR OY [FI], et al) [X] 1,10,11,22-32 * claims 1-15 * * examples 1-4 * * page 10, line 18 - page 11, line 12 * [I] 1-42; | [XI]WO9641530 (CULTOR OY [FI], et al) [X] 1,10,11,22-32,41,42 * claims 1-19 * * examples 3-8 * * page 13, paragraph 2 * [I] 1-42; | [XI]WO9708951 (CULTOR OY [FI], et al) [X] 1,10,11,22-32 * claims 1-19 * * examples 1-3,5-11 * * page 10, paragraph l - page 11, paragraph 3 * [I] 1-42; | [XI]WO9837763 (TALL HOLDINGS PTY LTD AB [AU], et al) [X] 1,22-31 * claims 1-19 * [I] 1-9,22-42; | [XI]WO9901032 (UNIV QUEBEC MONTREAL [CA], et al) [X] 1,10,11,22-32 * claims 1-24 * * page 8, paragraph 2 * [I] 1-42; | [XI]FR2990107 (INNOVATION TECH EXPANSION COMMERCIALE ITHEC [FR]) [X] 1,22-31 * claims 1-5 * * page 3, paragraph 3 * * page 5, paragraph 5 * [I] 1-9,22-42; | [XPI]WO2018187345 (SPOGEN BIOTECH INC [US]) [XP] 1,10,11,22-32,41,42 * claims 64-81,113-122 * * paragraph [0412] * * examples 2-8,11-15,17,20-21,23,25-29,31-36,39 * [I] 1-42; | [XI] - QI, LI-PAN ET AL, "Effects of chemical regulation on maize photosynthesis and yield under low temperature stress during grain filling stage", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 159:621184, URL: STN, XP002787858 [X] 1,10,11,22-32 * abstract * [I] 1-42 | [XI] - ZHANG, LI XIN ET AL, "Differential plant growth and osmotic effects of two maize (Zea mays L.) cultivars to exogenous glycinebetaine application under", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 151:141583, URL: STN, XP002787859 [X] 1,10,11,22-32 * abstract * [I] 1-42 | [ ] - ZHANG, LI XIN ET AL, "Differential plant growth and osmotic effects of two maize (Zea mays L.) cultivars to exogenous glycinebetaine application under", PLANT GROWTH REGULATION , 58(3), 297-305 CODEN: PGRED3; ISSN: 0167-6903, (2009), doi:10.1007/S10725-009-9379-7 10.1007/S10725-009-9379-7 | [XI] - NAWAZ, KHALID ET AL, "Modulation of growth parameters, proline content and mineral nutrients in maize (Zea mays L.) by exogenously applied glycinebetaine at different growth stages under salt stress", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 154:405357, URL: STN, XP002787860 [X] 1,10,11,22-32 * abstract * [I] 1-42 | [XI] - RAZA, MUHAMMAD AOWN SAMMAR ET AL, "Glycinebetaine applied under drought improved the physiological efficiency of wheat (Triticum aestivum L.) plant", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 157:457358, URL: STN, XP002787861 [X] 1,10,11,22-32 * abstract * [I] 1-42 | [XI] - ANJUM, SHAKEEL AHMAD ET AL, "Protective role of glycinebetaine in maize against antioxidative system", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 157:628371, URL: STN, XP002787862 [X] 1,10,11,22-32 * abstract * [I] 1-42 | [XI] - MAKELA, P. ET AL, "Effect of foliar applications of glycinebetaine on and summer turnip rape in Finland", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 125:240804, URL: STN, XP002787863 [X] 1,10,11,22-32 * abstract * [I] 1-42 | [ ] - MAKELA, P. ET AL, "Effect of foliar applications of glycinebetaine on and summer turnip rape in Finland", JOURNAL OF AGRONOMY AND CROP SCIENCE , 176(4), 223-234 CODEN: JASCEV; ISSN: 0931-2250, (1996), doi:10.1111/J.1439-037X.1996.TB00467.X 10.1111/J.1439-037X.1996.TB00467.X | [XI] - IQBAL, N. ET AL, "Influence of water stress and exogenous glycinebetaine on sunflower achene weight and oil percentage", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 144:65440, URL: STN, XP002787864 [X] 1,10,11,22-32 * abstract * [I] 1-42 | [ ] - IQBAL, N. ET AL, "Influence of water stress and exogenous glycinebetaine on sunflower achene weight and oil percentage", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF ENVIRONMENTAL SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY , 2(2), 155-160 CODEN: IJESHU; ISSN: 1735-1472, (2005), doi:10.1007/BF03325870 10.1007/BF03325870 | [XI] - AGBOMA, P. C. ET AL, "Exogenous glycinebetaine enhances grain yield of maize, sorghum, and wheat grown under two supplementary watering regimes", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 127:132265, URL: STN, XP002787865 [X] 1,10,11,22-32 * abstract * [I] 1-42 | [ ] - AGBOMA, P. C. ET AL, "Exogenous glycinebetaine enhances grain yield of maize, sorghum, and wheat grown under two supplementary watering regimes", JOURNAL OF AGRONOMY AND CROP SCIENCE , 178(1), 29-37 CODEN: JASCEV; ISSN: 0931-2250, (1997), doi:10.1111/J.1439-037X.1997.TB00348.X 10.1111/J.1439-037X.1997.TB00348.X | [XI] - MICKELBART, MICHAEL V. ET AL, "Endogenous levels and exogenous application of glycinebetaine to grapevines", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 146:396622, URL: STN, XP002787866 [X] 1,10,11,22-32 * abstract * [I] 1-42 | [ ] - MICKELBART, MICHAEL V. ET AL, "Endogenous levels and exogenous application of glycinebetaine to grapevines", SCIENTIA HORTICULTURAE (AMSTERDAM, NETHERLANDS) , 111(1), 7-16 CODEN: SHRTAH; ISSN: 0304-4238, (2006), doi:10.1016/J.SCIENTA.2006.07.031 10.1016/J.SCIENTA.2006.07.031 | [XI] - WANG, YI-MING ET AL, "Effects of exogenous betaine on physiological responses of peach tree under water stress", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 147:402099, URL: STN, XP002787867 [X] 1,10,11,22-32 * abstract * [I] 1-42 | by applicant | WO9535022 |