EP3697488 - CHANGING CATHETER INTO STEERING TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.04.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bendit Technologies Ltd. 6 Hatnufa Street 4951024 Petah Tikva / IL | [2024/22] |
Former [2020/35] | For all designated states Bendit Technologies Ltd. 6 Hatnufa Street 4951024 Petah Tikva / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CABIRI, Oz 11A HaGesher Street 4526611 Hod HaSharon / IL | [2020/35] | Representative(s) | Wright, Howard Hugh Burnby Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [2024/22] |
Former [2020/35] | Jaeger, Michael David Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 18811913.5 | 15.10.2018 | [2020/35] | WO2018IB57960 | Priority number, date | US201715786616 | 18.10.2017 Original published format: US201715786616 | [2020/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019077461 | Date: | 25.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3697488 | Date: | 26.08.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.04.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3697488 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/01, A61M25/00 | [2020/35] | CPC: |
A61M25/0147 (EP,US);
A61M25/0133 (US);
A61M25/0102 (US);
A61M25/09 (US);
A61B2017/003 (US);
A61M2025/0004 (EP,US);
A61M25/0113 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | UMWANDLUNG EINES KATHETERS IN EIN LENKWERKZEUG | [2020/35] | English: | CHANGING CATHETER INTO STEERING TOOL | [2020/35] | French: | CHANGEMENT D'UN CATHÉTER EN UN OUTIL D'ORIENTATION | [2020/35] | Entry into regional phase | 14.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 14.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/35] | 14.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2011137309 (OGLE DAVID BRUCE [AU], et al); | [X]US2013116705 (SALAHIEH AMR [US], et al); | [A]US2013304035 (CABIRI OZ [IL]); | [XD]US2016310702 (CABIRI OZ [IL]); | [A]WO2017158069 (RAMSTEDT MADELEINE [SE]) | by applicant | WO2014US71075 | WO2017IB51040 |