EP3720602 - A MICROFLUIDIC DEVICE AND A METHOD FOR PROVISION OF DOUBLE EMULSION DROPLETS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samplix ApS Mileparken 28 2730 Herlev / DK | [2020/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KVIST, Thomas Dalengen 11 4000 Roskilde / DK | 02 /
MADSEN, Esben Bjørn Landsevej 14A 2840 Holte / DK | 03 /
CHERRE, Solène Allerod Park 5, 1.tv 3450 Allerod / DK | 04 /
MIKKELSEN, Marie Just Stenmaglevej 13 2700 Brønshøj / DK | [2020/42] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2020/42] | Application number, filing date | 18812166.9 | 04.12.2018 | [2020/42] | WO2018EP83493 | Priority number, date | EP20170205776 | 06.12.2017 Original published format: EP 17205776 | [2020/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019110590 | Date: | 13.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3720602 | Date: | 14.10.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/00, B01F13/00, B01F13/08, B01F13/10, B01F3/08 | [2020/42] | CPC: |
B01L3/502715 (EP,US);
B01L3/502784 (EP,US);
B01F23/41 (EP);
B01F23/4105 (US);
B01F23/4144 (EP,US);
B01F33/3011 (EP,US);
B01F33/3017 (EP,US);
B01F33/813 (EP);
B01L3/502707 (EP,US);
B01F2101/23 (US);
B01F23/4143 (US);
B01L2200/028 (EP,US);
B01L2200/06 (US);
B01L2200/0673 (EP,US);
B01L2200/12 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/42] | Title | German: | MIKROFLUIDISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON DOPPELEMULSIONSTRÖPFCHEN | [2020/42] | English: | A MICROFLUIDIC DEVICE AND A METHOD FOR PROVISION OF DOUBLE EMULSION DROPLETS | [2020/42] | French: | DISPOSITIF MICROFLUIDIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FOURNITURE DE GOUTTELETTES D'ÉMULSION DOUBLE | [2020/42] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/42] | 23.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2015292988 (BHARADWAJ RAJIV [US], et al) [Y] 1-18 * figures 3-5 *; | [Y]WO2015160919 (HARVARD COLLEGE [US]) [Y] 1-18* figure 1A; example 1; claim - *; | [Y]US2016144329 (WESNER JOHN CHRISTOPHER [US], et al) [Y] 1-18 * paragraph [0120]; figure 6; claim - *; | [Y]US2017065979 (NESS KEVIN D [US], et al) [Y] 1-18 * paragraphs [0120] , [ 132] - [0136]; figures 5,8,9,43,44 * | by applicant | US7772287 | US2012211084 | US8802027 | US9039273 | US9238206 | US2017022538 | - "Contact Angle and Wetting Properties", YUAN Y.; LEE T.R., Surface Science Techniques, Springer Series in Surface Sciences, (20130000), vol. 51 | - TAN, SAY HWA et al., "Oxygen Plasma Treatment for Reducing Hydrophobicity of a Sealed Polydimethylsiloxane Microchannel", Biomicrofluidics, (20100000), vol. 4.3, page 032204 | - BERTHIER, E.; E. W. K. YOUNG et al., "Engineers are from PDMS-land, Biologists are from Polystyrenia", Lab on a Chip, (20120000), vol. 12, no. 7, pages 1224 - 1237 | - BECKER, H.; C. GARTNER, "Polymer microfabrication technologies for microfluidic systems", Analytical and Bioanalytical Chemistry, (20080000), vol. 390, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1007/S00216-007-1692-2, pages 89 - 111, XP002587359 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/S00216-007-1692-2 | - SUBEDI, D.P.; TYATA, R.B; RIMAL, D., "Effect of UV-treatment on the wettability of polycarbonate", Kathmandu University Journal of science, engineering and technology, (20090000), vol. 5, no. II, pages 37 - 41 | - KJAER UNMACK LARSEN, E.; N. B. LARSEN, "One-step polymer surface modification for minimizing drug, protein, and DNA adsorption in microanalytical systems", Lab on a Chip, (20130000), vol. 13, no. 4, pages 669 - 675 | - A. EVREN OZGAM; KIRILL EFIMENKO; JAN GENZER, "Effect of ultraviolet/ozone treatment on the surface and bulk properties of poly(dimethyl siloxane) and poly(vinylmethyl siloxane) networks", Polymer, (20140000), vol. 55, no. 14, doi:doi:10.1016/j.polymer.2014.05.027, pages 3107 - 3119, XP028866024 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.polymer.2014.05.027 | EP20110838713 |