EP3704314 - EXCAVATOR MAN-LIFT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.09.2023 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.05.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SM | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Doosan Bobcat North America, Inc. 250 East Beaton Drive West Fargo, ND 58078 / US | [2024/01] |
Former [2020/37] | For all designated states Clark Equipment Company 250 East Beaton Drive West Fargo, ND 58078-6000 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANSEN, Ronald, S. 6045 County Road 23 Leonard ND 58052 / US | [2020/37] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2020/37] | Application number, filing date | 18812430.9 | 02.11.2018 | [2020/37] | WO2018US59000 | Priority number, date | US201762580747P | 02.11.2017 Original published format: US 201762580747 P | [2020/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019090108 | Date: | 09.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3704314 | Date: | 09.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3704314 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | E02F3/36, B66F11/04, B66F17/00, E02F3/96 | [2020/37] | CPC: |
B66F11/044 (EP,KR,US);
E02F3/96 (EP,KR,US);
B66F17/006 (KR,US);
E02F3/3609 (EP,KR,US);
E02F3/3677 (EP,US);
E02F3/3681 (EP,KR,US);
E02F9/16 (KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BAGGERAUFZUG | [2020/37] | English: | EXCAVATOR MAN-LIFT | [2020/37] | French: | ASCENSEUR D'EXCAVATRICE | [2020/37] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/37] | 23.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 01.11.2023 | HR | 01.11.2023 | PL | 01.11.2023 | RS | 01.11.2023 | SM | 01.11.2023 | NO | 01.02.2024 | GR | 02.02.2024 | IS | 01.03.2024 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/25] | ES | 01.11.2023 | |
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 01.11.2023 | |
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 02.02.2024 | |
IS | 01.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0099485 (FREY WIGGER PAUL) [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 1-19; | [Y]DE102010045842 (SAUER THOMAS [DE]) [Y] 1-19 * paragraph [0027]; figure 5 *; | [Y]US2012211301 (CLARK BRIAN [US], et al) [Y] 2,3,5,7,8,10-16 * abstract *; | [A]US2013313044 (STEWART J AUBREY [CA]) [A] 1-19* abstract *; | [Y]EP2684836 (LEON GONZALEZ MIGUEL [ES]) [Y] 13-18 * abstract *; | [Y]FR3007013 (HAULOTTE GROUP [FR]) [Y] 3-6,19 * abstract * * sentence 5 - sentence 22 *; | [Y]US2015217981 (BAILLARGEON PAUL D [US], et al) [Y] 3,5 * abstract *; | [Y]WO2016176782 (LINEPRO EQUIPMENT LTD [CA]) [Y] 9,13-16,19 * abstract * | Examination | EP0099485 | WO2016097367 |