EP3627524 - INDUCTOR AND POWER-SWITCHING CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.01.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.02.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.03.2021 [2021/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2020/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XU, Shichao Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2020/13] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2020/13] | Application number, filing date | 18813268.2 | 25.01.2018 | [2020/13] | WO2018CN74189 | Priority number, date | CN201710433222 | 09.06.2017 Original published format: CN201710433222 | [2020/13] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018223715 | Date: | 13.12.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3627524 | Date: | 25.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 13.12.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01F27/28, H01F27/30, H01F17/00, H02M7/48, H02M3/335 | [2020/13] | CPC: |
H01F27/2804 (EP,CN,US);
H01F17/00 (EP,CN);
H01F27/24 (US);
H01F27/2847 (EP,CN);
H01F27/2895 (EP,CN);
H01F27/306 (EP,CN);
H02M3/1584 (EP);
H02M3/335 (CN);
H02M7/48 (CN);
H02M7/487 (EP,US);
H02M7/537 (US);
H01F2027/2814 (EP,US);
H02M3/1586 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/13] | Title | German: | INDUKTOR UND LEISTUNGSSCHALTKREIS | [2020/13] | English: | INDUCTOR AND POWER-SWITCHING CIRCUIT | [2020/13] | French: | INDUCTEUR ET CIRCUIT DE COMMUTATION DE PUISSANCE | [2020/13] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2019 | Translation filed | 16.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2019 | Search fee paid | 16.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/13] | 22.09.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/09] | 13.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPS6142810U (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD.) [X] 1-7 * figures 1(a), 1(b) * [I] 12,13; | [XI]JPS648710U (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO., LTD.) [X] 1-7,9,10 * figure 1 * [I] 12,13; | [XI]US2003025585 (MACERINI SAURO [IT]) [X] 1,2,5-8,11 * paragraph [0001]; figures 5, 8-10 * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0051] * [I] 12,13; | [XI]CN101587769 (DELTA ELECTRONICS INC [CN]) [X] 1-5,9-11 * page 6, line 23 - line 26; figures 2A, 2B, 2C, 2D, 2E * [I] 12,13; | [A]CN102437770 (SUNGROW POWER CO LTD) [A] 12 * figure 1 *; | [A]US8704457 (CHANG WEN-TI [TW], et al) [A] 13* figures 3, 4A, 4B * | International search | [X]CN101471173 (DELTA ELECTRONICS INC [CN]) [X] 1-13 * , description, page 3, line 6 to page 5, the third line from the bottom, and figures 1-7 *; | [A]CN101587769 (DELTA ELECTRONICS INC [CN]) [A] 1-13* , entire document *; | [A]CN201927466U (FOXCONN KUNSHAN COMP INTERFACE, et al) [A] 1-13 * , entire document *; | [PX]CN107527727 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [PX] 1-13 * , claims 1-13 * |