EP3636818 - LONG-FIBER NONWOVEN FABRIC AND FILTER REINFORCEMENT MATERIAL USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.10.2022 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.01.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.11.2022 [2022/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOBO CO., LTD. 13-1, Umeda 1-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2022/25] | For all designated states TOYOBO CO., LTD. 13-1, Umeda 1-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 5300001 / JP | ||
Former [2020/16] | For all designated states Toyobo Co., Ltd. 2-8 Dojima Hama 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8230 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIDA, Hideo c/o TOYOBO CO. LTD. 1-1 Katata 2-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 520-0292 / JP | 02 /
KATSUKI, Chiaki c/o TOYOBO CO. LTD. 1-1 Katata 2-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 520-0292 / JP | 03 /
SAIJO, Masahiro c/o TOYOBO CO. LTD. 1-1 Katata 2-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 520-0292 / JP | [2020/16] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2020/16] | Application number, filing date | 18813369.8 | 04.06.2018 | [2020/16] | WO2018JP21329 | Priority number, date | JP20170114230 | 09.06.2017 Original published format: JP 2017114230 | [2020/16] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018225671 | Date: | 13.12.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3636818 | Date: | 15.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.12.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | D04H3/016, D04H3/16, B01D39/16, // B01D46/52 | [2021/07] | CPC: |
D04H3/16 (EP,US);
D04H3/011 (US);
B01D39/163 (EP);
D04H3/016 (EP);
D04H3/14 (EP);
B01D2239/0216 (EP);
B01D2239/0654 (EP);
B01D2239/0668 (EP);
B01D2239/1233 (EP,US);
B01D2239/1291 (EP);
B01D46/521 (EP);
B32B5/022 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/16] | D04H3/016, D04H3/011 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/16] | Title | German: | LANGFASERVLIESSTOFF UND FILTERVERSTÄRKUNGSMATERIAL DAMIT | [2020/16] | English: | LONG-FIBER NONWOVEN FABRIC AND FILTER REINFORCEMENT MATERIAL USING SAME | [2020/16] | French: | TISSU NON TISSÉ À FIBRES LONGUES ET MATÉRIAU DE RENFORCEMENT DE FILTRE FAISANT APPEL AUDIT TISSU | [2020/16] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2019 | Translation filed | 19.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2019 | Search fee paid | 19.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/16] | 04.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/46] | 29.06.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2022/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2022 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP3527706 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [E] 1* paragraph [0217]; examples 2, 8, 21 * | International search | [A]JPH04176311 (IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO) [A] 1-5 * , claims, examples (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH0544218U (JAPAN VILENE CO., LTD.) [A] 1-5 * , claims, paragraph [0013] (Family: none) *; | [A]US2008302072 (HASSMANN CHRISTIAN [DE], et al) [A] 1-5* , claims & US 2011/0253645 A1 & EP 2006009 A2 & DE 102007027299 A *; | [A]JP2010119998 (AMBIC CO LTD) [A] 1-5 * , claims, examples (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2011000536 (TOYO BOSEKI) [A] 1-5 * , claims, examples (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2012017529 (TOYO BOSEKI) [A] 1-5 * , claims, examples & US 2013/0111861 A1, claims, examples & WO 2012/004905 A1 & CN 102985608 A *; | [A]JP2014064969 (TOYO BOSEKI) [A] 1-5 * , claims, paragraph [0013] (Family: none) * | by applicant | JP2000199164 | JP2008231597 | JP2011000536 |