EP3636797 - EVAPORATION MASK PLATE, EVAPORATION MASK PLATE SET, AND ALIGNMENT TESTING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/16] | EVAPORATION MASK PLATE, SHEATHING EVAPORATION MASK PLATE, EVAPORATION SYSTEM AND ALIGNMENT TESTING METHOD | ||
[2023/24] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOE Technology Group Co., Ltd. No. 10 Jiuxianqiao Rd. Chaoyang District Beijing 100015 / CN | For all designated states Chengdu BOE Optoelectronics Technology Co., Ltd. No. 1188, Hezuo Road (West Zone) Hi-tech Development Zone Chengdu, Sichuan 611731 / CN | [2020/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DING, Weiwei No.9 Dize Rd. BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 02 /
WU, Jianpeng No.9 Dize Rd. BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | [2020/16] | Representative(s) | Lavoix Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | [2023/37] |
Former [2020/16] | Lavoix Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18813393.8 | 05.01.2018 | [2020/16] | WO2018CN71549 | Priority number, date | CN201710414315 | 05.06.2017 Original published format: CN201710414315 | [2020/16] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018223695 | Date: | 13.12.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3636797 | Date: | 15.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3636797 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 13.12.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C23C14/04, C23C14/24, C23C14/12, // H10K71/00, H10K71/16 | [2023/27] | CPC: |
C23C14/042 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H10K71/166 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C23C14/04 (EP);
C23C14/12 (EP,KR,US);
C23C14/24 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H10K71/00 (US);
|
Former IPC [2023/24] | C23C14/04, C23C14/24, C23C14/12, H10K71/16, // H10K71/00 | ||
Former IPC [2023/22] | C23C14/04, C23C14/24, C23C14/12, // H10K71/00 | ||
Former IPC [2021/17] | C23C14/04, H01L51/00, C23C14/12, H01L51/56, C23C14/24 | ||
Former IPC [2020/16] | C23C14/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERDAMPFUNGSMASKENPLATTE, VERDAMPFUNGSMASKENPLATTENSATZ, UND AUSRICHTUNGSPRÜFVERFAHREN | [2023/24] | English: | EVAPORATION MASK PLATE, EVAPORATION MASK PLATE SET, AND ALIGNMENT TESTING METHOD | [2023/24] | French: | PLAQUE DE MASQUE D'ÉVAPORATION, ENSEMBLE DE MASQUES D'ÉVAPORATION , ET PROCÉDÉ DE TEST D'ALIGNEMENT | [2023/24] |
Former [2020/16] | VERDAMPFUNGSMASKENPLATTE, UMMANTELNDE VERDAMPFUNGSMASKENPLATTE, VERDAMPFUNGSSYSTEM UND AUSRICHTUNGSPRÜFVERFAHREN | ||
Former [2020/16] | EVAPORATION MASK PLATE, SHEATHING EVAPORATION MASK PLATE, EVAPORATION SYSTEM AND ALIGNMENT TESTING METHOD | ||
Former [2020/16] | PLAQUE DE MASQUE D'ÉVAPORATION, PLAQUE DE MASQUE D'ÉVAPORATION DE GAINAGE, SYSTÈME D'ÉVAPORATION ET PROCÉDÉ DE TEST D'ALIGNEMENT | Entry into regional phase | 29.08.2019 | Translation filed | 29.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.2019 | Search fee paid | 29.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.2019 | Examination requested [2020/16] | 13.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.09.2023 | CZ | 13.09.2023 | DK | 13.09.2023 | EE | 13.09.2023 | ES | 13.09.2023 | FI | 13.09.2023 | HR | 13.09.2023 | IT | 13.09.2023 | LT | 13.09.2023 | LV | 13.09.2023 | MC | 13.09.2023 | NL | 13.09.2023 | PL | 13.09.2023 | RO | 13.09.2023 | RS | 13.09.2023 | SE | 13.09.2023 | SK | 13.09.2023 | SM | 13.09.2023 | NO | 13.12.2023 | GR | 14.12.2023 | LU | 05.01.2024 | IS | 13.01.2024 | PT | 15.01.2024 | [2024/43] |
Former [2024/40] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
DK | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
IT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
MC | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
DK | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
IT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
IT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 13.09.2023 | |
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006011136 (YAMAZAKI SHUNPEI [JP], et al); | [X]US2015059643 (DU WEICHONG [CN], et al); | [A]US2016322571 (LEE SANGSHIN [KR], et al); | [X]CN206015074U (KUNSHAN GOVISIONOX OPTOELECTRONICS CO LTD) | International search | [A]US2003221614 (KANG CHANG-HO [KR], et al); | [A]CN104808434 (HEFEI BOE OPTOELECTRONICS TECH, et al); | [Y]CN204803392U (KUNSHAN GOVISIONOX OPTOELECTRONICS CO LTD); | [A]CN105803389 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD, et al); | [A]CN205844737U (KUNSHAN GOVISIONOX OPTOELECTRONICS CO LTD); | [XY]CN206015074U (KUNSHAN GOVISIONOX OPTOELECTRONICS CO LTD) |