EP3634430 - MULTIBIOTIC AGENTS AND METHODS OF USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Flagship Pioneering Innovations V, Inc. 55 Cambridge Parkway, 8th Floor Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | [2020/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CASEY, Jr., John Patrick 1 Goodwin Place 4 Boston, MA 02114 / US | 02 /
BERRY, David 155 Beethoven Avenue Waban, MA 02468 / US | 03 /
CASTRO, Alfredo 14 Kelly Drive Woburn, MA 01801 / US | 04 /
TAYLOR, Steven J. 17 Hill Street Winchester, MA 01890 / US | 05 /
MASSARI, Ferdinand E. 33 Crescent Avenue Beverly, MA 01915 / US | 06 /
PROUDFOOT, John 40 Currituck Road Newtown, CT 06470 / US | 07 /
BOGART, Elijah 27 Putnam Avenue 2 Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 08 /
BRIGGS, Timothy F. 105 Vernon Street Unit 2 Waltham, MA 02453 / US | [2020/16] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [2024/32] |
Former [2020/16] | Dörner, Eva Charlotte Maiwald Patentanwalts- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18814051.1 | 05.06.2018 | [2020/16] | WO2018US36113 | Priority number, date | US201762515409P | 05.06.2017 Original published format: US 201762515409 P | US201862613359P | 03.01.2018 Original published format: US 201862613359 P | US201862632531P | 20.02.2018 Original published format: US 201862632531 P | [2020/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018226732 | Date: | 13.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3634430 | Date: | 15.04.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3634430 | Date: | 07.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.12.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/7034, A61K31/05, A61K31/09, A61K31/122, A61K31/137, A61K31/14, A61K31/155, A61K31/353, A61K31/366, A61K31/606, A61P13/12, A61P43/00, A61K47/54, C07C403/24 | [2024/08] | CPC: |
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61K31/353 (EP,KR);
A61K31/155 (EP,KR,US);
A23L33/11 (US);
A61K31/05 (EP);
A61K31/09 (EP);
A61K31/12 (KR);
A61K31/122 (EP);
A61K31/137 (EP);
A61K31/14 (EP);
A61K31/164 (US);
A61K31/192 (US);
A61K31/196 (KR);
A61K31/197 (US);
A61K31/203 (KR);
A61K31/205 (US);
A61K31/355 (US);
A61K31/366 (EP,US);
A61K31/37 (KR);
A61K31/375 (KR,US);
A61K31/397 (KR);
A61K31/592 (US);
A61K31/606 (EP);
A61K31/702 (US);
A61K31/7034 (EP,KR);
A61K31/7068 (KR);
A61K31/728 (US);
A61K38/063 (KR);
A61K38/08 (US);
A61K47/54 (EP);
A61K47/549 (EP);
A61K9/0014 (US);
A61K9/0029 (US);
A61K9/0053 (US);
A61K9/1623 (US);
A61P1/16 (KR);
A61P17/00 (KR);
A61P21/00 (KR);
A61P29/00 (KR);
A61P3/10 (KR);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (KR);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/05, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/09, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/122, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/137, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/14, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/155, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/353, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/366, A61K2300/00 (EP); |
Former IPC [2021/15] | A61K31/7034, A61P13/12, A61K31/606, A61K31/366, A61P43/00, A61K31/353, A61K31/05, A61K31/09, A61K31/122, A61K31/137, A61K31/14, A61K31/155 | ||
Former IPC [2020/16] | A61K31/7034, A61P13/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/16] | Extension states | BA | 02.01.2020 | ME | 02.01.2020 | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MULTIBIOTIKA UND VERWENDUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2020/16] | English: | MULTIBIOTIC AGENTS AND METHODS OF USING THE SAME | [2020/16] | French: | AGENTS MULTIBIOTIQUES ET PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION DE CEUX-CI | [2020/16] | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2020 | Search fee paid | 02.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/16] | 29.10.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 07.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 07.01.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 07.01.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.01.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2012230955 (EKHART PETER FRANK [BE], et al); | [XI]US2016213702 (VON MALTZAHN GEOFFREY A [US], et al) | International search | [Y]US5677340 (YU RUEY J [US], et al) [Y] 321 * ; abstract *; | [Y]US6784177 (COHN JAY N [US], et al) [Y] 318 * ; abstract *; | [Y]US2004265345 (PERRICONE NICHOLAS V [US]) [Y] 7 * ; abstract *; | [Y]WO2005000248 (GERON CORP [US], et al) [Y] 317 * ; pg. 3, In 9-11, pg. 4, In 5 *; | [Y]US2010310615 (VERCAUTEREN JOSEPH [FR]) [Y] 5, 316 * ; para [0001], [0040] *; | [XY]US2012010284 (BEZWADA RAO S [US]) [X] 1, 2, 4, 8, 311-313, 315, 323 * ; para [0002]-[0003], [0010][0011], [0019], [0024], [0064], [0073], [0091] * [Y] 5-7, 314, 316-322, 324; | [Y]US8388939 (FOURNIAL ARNAUD [FR], et al) [Y] 319 * ; col 2, In 11-12, abstract *; | [Y]WO2013142279 (SEACHAID PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]) [Y] 322 * ; pg. 2, In 33-35, pg. 18, In 20-22 *; | [XY]WO2016025668 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [X] 1-3, 64-65 * ; para [0003], [0012], [0021]-[0022], figure 27 * [Y] 320; | [Y] - JANIKULA Mark, "Policosanol: A New Treatment for Cardiovascular Disease?", Alternative Medicine Review: A journal of clinical therapeutic, (20020600), vol. 7, no. 3, pages 203 - 217, XP055562247 [Y] 6 * ; pg. 203, abstract * | [Y] - LIN et al., "Improving the Stability of Astaxanthin by Microencapsulation in Calcium Alginate Beads", PLOS ONE, (20160419), vol. 11, no. 4, pages 1 - 10, XP055562248 [Y] 314 * Pg. 1, para 1, abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0153685 | [Y] - HWANG et al., "Antifungal Effect of (+)-Pinoresinol Isolated from Sambucus williamsii", Molecules, (20100514), vol. 15, no. 5, pages 3507 - 3516, XP055562252 [Y] 324 * Pg. 3507, abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/molecules15053507 | by applicant | US5112598 | US5556611 | US2012010284 | US2012230955 | WO2016025668 | US2016213702 | - MAURER et al., PLoS ONE, (20150000), vol. 10, page e0129076 | - SINGH, Immunity, (20140000), vol. 40, pages 128 - 39 | - YAMASHITA et al., Circ J., (20150000), vol. 79, pages 1882 - 90 | - ZHANG et al., Nutr Cancer., (20100000), vol. 62, no. 1, pages 1 - 20 | - UNGVARI et al., Am J Physiol Heart Circ Physiol., (20090000), vol. 297, no. 5, pages H1876 - 81 | - CHEN, Biochem Biophys Res Commun., (20160000), vol. 481, no. 1-2, pages 63 - 70 | - TOLHURST, Diabetes., (20020000), vol. 61, no. 2, pages 364 - 71 | - CHAMBERS, Proc Nutr Soc., (20150000), vol. 74, no. 3, pages 328 - 36 | - HAN, Exp Mol Med., (20030000), vol. 35, no. 2, pages 136 - 9 | - QIN, J Immunol., (20110000), vol. 186, no. 6, pages 3693 - 700 | - WONG, Immunol Lett., (20110000), vol. 139, no. 1-2, pages 7 - 13 | - FARRNNINMARI, J., Hypertens.,, (19980000), vol. 16, pages 895 - 906 | - RABOL et al., Proc. Nat. Acad. Sci., (20110000), vol. 108, pages 13705 - 13709 | - ZELANTE, Immunity., (20130000), vol. 39, no. 2, pages 372 - 85 | - STRATTON, J Clin Nutr, (20060000), vol. 84, pages 384 - 8 | - BARTON et al., Gut, (20170000), vol. 0, pages 1 - 9 | - TROMBOLD, Medicine and Science in sports and exercise, (20100000), page 493 | - RYU, Nature Medicine, (20160000), vol. 22, pages 879 - 888 | - ABRAHAMSSON, J Allergy Clin Immunol., (20120000), vol. 129, no. 2, pages 434 - 40 | - TUNDIS, Curr. Med. Chem., (20150000), vol. 22, pages 1515 - 1538 | - HAGHIKIA, Immunity, (20150000), vol. 43, pages 819 - 29 | - ROY, Nat Rev Cancer, (20170000), vol. 17, pages 271 - 285 | - MOUNDHRI, J Med Toxicol, (20130000), vol. 9, pages 25 - 33 |