EP3721654 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE, INFRASTRUCTURE EQUIPMENT AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.05.2022 Database last updated on 24.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.05.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | For:AL
Sony Europe Limited The Heights Brooklands Weybridge, Surrey KT13 0XW / GB | [2021/30] |
Former [2020/42] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | ||
For:AL
Sony Europe Limited The Heights Brooklands Weybridge, Surrey KT13 0XW / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEI, Yuxin c/o SONY Europe Limited Jays Close Viables Basingstoke Hampshire RG22 4SB / GB | 02 /
SHARMA, Vivek c/o SONY Europe Limited Jays Close Viables Basingstoke Hampshire RG22 4SB / GB | 03 /
WAKABAYASHI, Hideji c/o SONY Europe Limited Jays Close Viables Basingstoke Hampshire RG22 4SB / GB | 04 /
TSUDA, Shinichiro c/o SONY Europe Limited Jays Close Viables Basingstoke Hampshire RG22 4SB / GB | [2020/42] | Representative(s) | MFG Patentanwälte Meyer-Wildhagen Meggle-Freund Gerhard PartG mbB Amalienstraße 62 80799 München / DE | [2020/42] | Application number, filing date | 18814596.5 | 06.12.2018 | [2020/42] | WO2018EP83740 | Priority number, date | EP20170205827 | 07.12.2017 Original published format: EP 17205827 | [2020/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019110709 | Date: | 13.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3721654 | Date: | 14.10.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/00 | [2020/42] | CPC: |
H04W36/0061 (EP,US);
H04W36/0077 (US);
H04W36/0064 (EP,US);
H04W36/322 (EP,US);
H04W76/27 (US);
H04W64/003 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/42] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG, INFRASTRUKTURAUSRÜSTUNG UND VERFAHREN | [2020/42] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE, INFRASTRUCTURE EQUIPMENT AND METHODS | [2020/42] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE, ÉQUIPEMENT D'INFRASTRUCTURE ET PROCÉDÉS | [2020/42] | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/42] | 01.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2021 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 18.02.2021 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 20.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2006068789 (VANNITHAMBY RATH [US], et al); | [XI]WO2009057732 (NEC CORP [JP], et al); | [XI]EP2403295 (ZTE CORP [CN]); | [XI]GB2498898 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [XI]EP3101941 (NEC CORP [JP]) |