EP3728378 - METHOD FOR THE PREPARATION OF POLYURETHANE HARD FOAM COMPOSITE ELEMENTS USING MANNICH POLYOLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/44] | METHOD FOR PRODUCING POLYURETHANE HARD FOAM COMPOSITE ELEMENTS USING MANNICH POLYOLS | ||
[2023/13] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [2020/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JACOBMEIER, Olaf Elastogranstraße 60 49448 Lemfoerde / DE | 02 /
KALUSCHKE, Tobias Elastogranstraße 60 49448 Lemfoerde / DE | 03 /
RENNER, Christian Elastogranstraße 60 49448 Lemfoerde / DE | 04 /
THATER, Michael Elastogranstraße 60 49448 Lemfoerde / DE | [2020/44] | Representative(s) | BASF IP Association BASF SE GBI-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2020/44] | Application number, filing date | 18814920.7 | 11.12.2018 | [2020/44] | WO2018EP84331 | Priority number, date | EP20170209668 | 21.12.2017 Original published format: EP 17209668 | [2020/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019121158 | Date: | 27.06.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3728378 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3728378 | Date: | 16.08.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/54, C08G18/42, C08G18/48, C08G18/76, C08G18/22, C08G18/16, C08G18/18, C08G101/00 | [2020/44] | CPC: |
C08G18/546 (EP,US);
C08G18/4213 (EP,US);
C08G18/163 (EP,US);
C08G18/18 (EP,US);
C08G18/225 (EP,US);
C08G18/4288 (EP,US);
C08G18/4812 (EP,US);
C08G18/4816 (EP,US);
C08G18/4829 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POLYURETHAN-HARTSCHAUMSTOFF-VERBUNDELEMENTEN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON MANNICH-POLYOLEN | [2020/44] | English: | METHOD FOR THE PREPARATION OF POLYURETHANE HARD FOAM COMPOSITE ELEMENTS USING MANNICH POLYOLS | [2023/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'ÉLÉMENTS COMPOSITES EN MOUSSES DURES DE POLYURÉTHANE À L'AIDE DE POLYOLS DE MANNICH | [2023/13] |
Former [2020/44] | METHOD FOR PRODUCING POLYURETHANE HARD FOAM COMPOSITE ELEMENTS USING MANNICH POLYOLS | ||
Former [2020/44] | PROCÉDÉ POUR LA PRODUCTION D'ÉLÉMENTS COMPOSITES DE POLYURÉTHANE-MOUSSE DURE À L'AIDE DE POLYOLS DE MANNICH | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/44] | 21.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 16.08.2023 | DK | 16.08.2023 | EE | 16.08.2023 | FI | 16.08.2023 | HR | 16.08.2023 | LT | 16.08.2023 | LV | 16.08.2023 | MC | 16.08.2023 | NL | 16.08.2023 | PL | 16.08.2023 | RO | 16.08.2023 | RS | 16.08.2023 | SE | 16.08.2023 | SI | 16.08.2023 | SK | 16.08.2023 | SM | 16.08.2023 | NO | 16.11.2023 | GR | 17.11.2023 | LU | 11.12.2023 | IS | 16.12.2023 | PT | 18.12.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | CZ | 16.08.2023 | |
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
EE | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SI | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 16.08.2023 | |
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
EE | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | CZ | 16.08.2023 | |
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 16.08.2023 | |
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 16.08.2023 | |
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 16.08.2023 | |
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 16.08.2023 | |
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | Cited in | International search | [X]KR20160023050 (SUNKYUNG POLYURETHANE CO LTD [KR]); | [X]WO2017155863 (BASF SE [DE]) |