EP3703715 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR HEMATOPOIETIC STEM AND PROGENITOR CELL TRANSPLANT THERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.03.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.05.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.01.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EdiGene Biotechnology, Inc. Life Science Park No. 22 KeXueYuan Road Beijing / CN | [2023/45] |
Former [2020/37] | For all designated states Magenta Therapeutics, Inc. 100 Technology Square Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOITANO, Anthony 27 Evelyn Road Newton Massachusetts 02468 / US | 02 /
COOKE, Michael 135 University Road No. 1 Brookline Massachusetts 02445 / US | [2020/37] | Representative(s) | Russell, Tim, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2020/37] | Application number, filing date | 18815378.7 | 31.10.2018 | [2020/37] | WO2018US58562 | Priority number, date | US201762579776P | 31.10.2017 Original published format: US 201762579776 P | US201762596661P | 08.12.2017 Original published format: US 201762596661 P | [2020/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019089833 | Date: | 09.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3703715 | Date: | 09.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/28, A61K35/51, C12N5/0789, A61P35/00 | [2020/37] | CPC: |
A61K35/28 (EP,US);
A61K31/435 (US);
A61K31/444 (US);
A61K31/4985 (US);
A61K31/52 (US);
A61K35/51 (EP);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61P35/00 (EP,US);
A61P7/00 (US);
C12N5/0647 (EP,US);
C12N2501/125 (EP);
C12N2501/145 (EP);
C12N2501/2306 (EP);
C12N2501/26 (EP);
C12N2501/999 (EP,US);
Y02A50/30 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/37] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN FÜR HÄMATOPOIETISCHE STAMM- UND VORLÄUFERZELLTRANSPLANTATIONSTHERAPIE | [2020/37] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR HEMATOPOIETIC STEM AND PROGENITOR CELL TRANSPLANT THERAPY | [2020/37] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS DE GREFFE DE CELLULES SOUCHES HÉMATOPOÏÉTIQUES | [2020/37] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/37] | 02.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2007095594 (CELLERANT THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-3,47,48,66,93-105 * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0051] *[I] 4-46,49-65,67-92; | [XI] - JOHN E. WAGNER ET AL, "Phase I/II Trial of StemRegenin-1 Expanded Umbilical Cord Blood Hematopoietic Stem Cells Supports Testing as a Stand-Alone Graft", CELL STEM CELL, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20160101), vol. 18, no. 1, doi:10.1016/j.stem.2015.10.004, ISSN 1934-5909, pages 144 - 155, XP055558717 [X] 1-3,47,48,66,93-105 * figure 1 * [I] 4-46,49-65,67-92 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.stem.2015.10.004 | [I] - ANTHONY E. BOITANO ET AL, "Aryl Hydrocarbon Receptor Antagonists Promote the Expansion of Human Hematopoietic Stem Cells", SCIENCE, US, (20100805), vol. 329, no. 5997, doi:10.1126/science.1191536, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 1345 - 1348, XP055558705 [I] 1-105 * figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1191536 | [XI] - NONNIEKAYE SHELBURNE ET AL, "Non-Myeloablative Allogeneic Hematopoietic Stem Cell Transplantation", SEMINARS IN ONCOLOGY NURSING, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20090501), vol. 25, no. 2, doi:10.1016/j.soncn.2009.03.006, ISSN 0749-2081, pages 120 - 128, XP055558587 [X] 1-3,47,48,66,93-105 * table 3 * [I] 4-46,49-65,67-92 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.soncn.2009.03.006 | by applicant | US5021409 | US5233044 | WO9411026 | US5512421 | US5547892 | US5583131 | US5670354 | US5698546 | US5801030 | WO9950461 | WO0002870 | US6028172 | US6080398 | WO0056729 | WO0144229 | WO0185196 | WO0194420 | US6447766 | WO03090512 | US2005112764 | US2006035829 | WO2007145227 | US7442386 | WO2010085699 | US2010227406 | US2010317114 | US8021867 | US8445251 | US8546350 | US8697359 | US9169287 | US9206222 | US9388212 | WO2016164502 | US9580426 | - BRUNSTEIN et al., Blood, (20100000), vol. 116, pages 4693 - 4699 | - EAPEN et al., Biol. Blood Marrow Transplant, (20170000), vol. 23, pages 1714 - 1721 | - EAPEN et al., Lancet Oncol., (20100000), vol. 11, pages 653 - 660 | - "Bone Marrow Transplantation for Non-Malignant Disease", ASH Education Book, (20000000), vol. 1, pages 319 - 338 | - YANIV et al., Nature, (19820000), vol. 297, page 17 | - CHU et al., Nucleic Acids Research, (19870000), vol. 15, page 1311 | - DISTLER et al., Experimental Dermatology, (20050000), vol. 14, page 315 | - SHAREI et al., Journal of Visualized Experiments, (20130000), vol. 81, page e50980 | - DENNIG, Topics in Current Chemistry, (20030000), vol. 228, page 227 | - GULICK et al., Current Protocols in Molecular Biology, (19970000), vol. 40, no. 1 | - HWANG et al., Nature Biotechnology, (20130000), vol. 31, page 227 | - UMOV et al., Nature Reviews Genetics, (20100000), vol. 11, page 636 | - JOUNG et al., Nature Reviews Molecular Cell Biology, (20130000), vol. 14, page 49 |