EP3716970 - CORROLES FOR TREATING HUMAN CYTOMEGALOVIRUS INFECTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.07.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Université de Bourgogne Esplanade Erasme - BP 27877 21078 Dijon Cedex / FR | [2020/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GROS, Claude 3 rue Jean Moulin 21800 Neuilly Les Dijon / FR | 02 /
GALLARDO, Franck 858 avenue de Montech 82000 Montauban / FR | 03 /
DESBOIS, Nicolas 1 Impasse du Tilleul 21110 Bessey Les Citeaux / FR | [2020/41] | Representative(s) | IPAZ Bâtiment Platon Parc Les Algorithmes 91190 Saint-Aubin / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/41] | IPAZ Parc Les Algorithmes, Bâtiment Platon CS 70003 Saint-Aubin 91192 Gif-sur-Yvette Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 18815547.7 | 27.11.2018 | [2020/41] | WO2018EP82695 | Priority number, date | EP20170306655 | 29.11.2017 Original published format: EP 17306655 | [2020/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019105928 | Date: | 06.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3716970 | Date: | 07.10.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3716970 | Date: | 01.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/409, A61P31/22, A61P31/12, A61K45/06, A61K31/517, A61K31/522, A61K31/675, A61K31/662 | [2021/16] | CPC: |
A61K31/409 (EP,US);
A61K31/444 (US);
A61K31/496 (US);
A61K31/517 (EP);
A61K31/522 (EP,US);
A61K31/662 (EP,US);
A61K31/675 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/22 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/409, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/517, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/522, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/662, A61K2300/00 (EP); |
Former IPC [2020/41] | A61K31/409, A61K45/06, A61P31/12, A61P31/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KORROLEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON HUMANEN CYTOMEGALOVIRUS-INFEKTIONEN | [2020/41] | English: | CORROLES FOR TREATING HUMAN CYTOMEGALOVIRUS INFECTIONS | [2020/41] | French: | CORROLES PERMETTANT DE TRAITER DES INFECTIONS À CYTOMÉGALOVIRUS HUMAIN | [2021/16] |
Former [2020/41] | CORROLES POUR LE TRAITEMENT D'INFECTIONS PAR LE CYTOMÉGALOVIRUS HUMAIN | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/41] | 16.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.04.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.07.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.06.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.11.2018 | AL | 01.09.2021 | AT | 01.09.2021 | CY | 01.09.2021 | CZ | 01.09.2021 | DK | 01.09.2021 | EE | 01.09.2021 | ES | 01.09.2021 | FI | 01.09.2021 | HR | 01.09.2021 | IT | 01.09.2021 | LT | 01.09.2021 | LV | 01.09.2021 | MC | 01.09.2021 | MK | 01.09.2021 | MT | 01.09.2021 | NL | 01.09.2021 | PL | 01.09.2021 | RO | 01.09.2021 | RS | 01.09.2021 | SE | 01.09.2021 | SI | 01.09.2021 | SK | 01.09.2021 | SM | 01.09.2021 | TR | 01.09.2021 | IE | 27.11.2021 | LU | 27.11.2021 | BE | 30.11.2021 | BG | 01.12.2021 | NO | 01.12.2021 | GR | 02.12.2021 | IS | 01.01.2022 | PT | 03.01.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 27.11.2018 | |
AL | 01.09.2021 | ||
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CY | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
IT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
MK | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
TR | 01.09.2021 | ||
IE | 27.11.2021 | ||
LU | 27.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/23] | HU | 27.11.2018 | |
AL | 01.09.2021 | ||
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CY | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
IT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
MK | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
IE | 27.11.2021 | ||
LU | 27.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 27.11.2018 | |
AL | 01.09.2021 | ||
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CY | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
IT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
IE | 27.11.2021 | ||
LU | 27.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 01.09.2021 | |
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CY | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
IT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
IE | 27.11.2021 | ||
LU | 27.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AL | 01.09.2021 | |
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
IT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
IE | 27.11.2021 | ||
LU | 27.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 01.09.2021 | |
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
IT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
LU | 27.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 01.09.2021 | |
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
LU | 27.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 01.09.2021 | |
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 01.09.2021 | |
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 01.09.2021 | |
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 01.09.2021 | |
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 01.09.2021 | |
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | ES | 01.09.2021 | |
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | ES | 01.09.2021 | |
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | ES | 01.09.2021 | |
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 01.09.2021 | |
NO | 01.12.2021 | Cited in | International search | [AD] - GROS CLAUDE P ET AL, "Synthesis and Antiviral Activity Evaluation of Nitroporphyrins and Nitrocorroles as Potential Agents against Human Cytomegalovirus Infection.", ACS INFECTIOUS DISEASES 14 AUG 2015, (20150814), vol. 1, no. 8, ISSN 2373-8227, pages 350 - 356, XP009504313 [AD] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acsinfecdis.5b00020 | [A] - KARL M. KADISH ET AL, "Clarification of the Oxidation State of Cobalt Corroles in Heterogeneous and Homogeneous Catalytic Reduction of Dioxygen", INORGANIC CHEMISTRY, EASTON, US, (20080627), vol. 47, no. 15, doi:10.1021/ic800458s, ISSN 0020-1669, pages 6726 - 6737, XP055461939 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ic800458s | [A] - Carla M.B. Carvalho, "Antimicrobial photodynamic activity of porphyrin derivatives: potential application on medical and water disinfection", Journal of Porphyrins and Phthalocyanines, (20090101), pages 574 - 577, URL: https://www.worldscientific.com/doi/pdf/10.1142/S1088424609000528, (20180321), XP055461677 [A] 1-13 * abstract * * page 575; figure 2 * | [AD] - GRYKO D T ET AL, "Refined methods for the synthesis of meso-substituted A3- and trans-A2B-corroles", ORGANIC & BIOMOLECULAR CHEMISTRY,, vol. 1, no. 2, doi:10.1039/B208950E, ISSN 1477-0520, (20030101), pages 350 - 357, (20021209), XP002595975 [AD] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/B208950E | by applicant | - GROS et al., Acs Infect. Dis., (20150000), vol. 1, pages 350 - 356 | - PAOLESSE et al., J. Org. Chem., (20010000), vol. 66, no. 2, pages 550 - 556 | - GRYKO, D. T.; KOSZARNA, B., Org. Biomol. Chem., (20030000), vol. 1, no. 2, pages 350 - 357 | - STRAETEMANS R et al., Biometrical Journal, (20050000), vol. 47, no. 3, pages 299 - 308 |