EP3720407 - CHAIR FOR TREATING A PATIENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 09.06.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.06.2023 | Refusal of application | published on 12.07.2023 [2023/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Curaden AG Amlehnstrasse 22 6010 Kriens / CH | [2020/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OSTWALD, Andreas Eppendorfer Baum 20 20249 Hamburg / DE | [2020/42] | Representative(s) | Keller Schneider Patent- und Markenanwälte AG Eigerstrasse 2 Postfach 3000 Bern 14 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2020/42] | Keller & Partner Patentanwälte AG Eigerstrasse 2 Postfach 3000 Bern 14 / CH | Application number, filing date | 18815636.8 | 05.12.2018 | [2020/42] | WO2018EP83677 | Priority number, date | CH20170001482 | 05.12.2017 Original published format: CH 14822017 | [2020/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019110675 | Date: | 13.06.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3720407 | Date: | 14.10.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61G15/02, A61G15/10 | [2020/42] | CPC: |
A61G15/10 (EP);
A61G15/02 (EP,CH)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/42] | Title | German: | STUHL ZUR BEHANDLUNG EINES PATIENTEN | [2020/42] | English: | CHAIR FOR TREATING A PATIENT | [2020/42] | French: | CHAISE POUR LE TRAITEMENT D'UN PATIENT | [2020/42] | Entry into regional phase | 03.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/42] | 03.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2023 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2023/28] | 09.02.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.02.2023 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 21.02.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2023/28] | Divisional application(s) | EP23169577.6 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3338632 (KLEINSORGE CARL T) [A] 1-24 * column 2, line 27 - column 3, line 24 * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE9418730U (SAUERESSIG ULRICH [DE]) [A] 1-24 * page 3, line 15 - page 4, line 13 ** figures 1-3 *; | [XAI]WO02053080 (SILHOUET TONE LTEE [CA], et al) [X] 1,4,7,15,17,18,22 * page 9, line 22 - page 10, line 32 * * figure 2 * [A] 2,3,10-14,16,19-21 [I] 5,6,8,9,23,24 | by applicant | DE2752528 |