EP3713444 - MASK FOR FACE CARE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.01.2023 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Feeligreen SA Bat Naxos 25 Allée Pierre Ziller 06560 Valbonne / FR | [2020/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAKOUB, Abdel 52 avenue de la Pépinière Bât. A2 06600 Antibes / FR | 02 /
BIANCHI, Christophe 9 Avenue Montclar 06100 Nice / FR | [2020/40] | Representative(s) | SEB Développement Direction Propriété industrielle - Brevets 112, chemin du Moulin Carron Campus SEB - CS 90229 69134 Ecully Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/40] | SEB Developpement Brevets SEB Developpement Direction de la propriété industrielle - Brevets Campus SEB - CS 90229 112, chemin du Moulin Carron 69134 Ecully Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 18815949.5 | 20.11.2018 | [2020/40] | WO2018EP81973 | Priority number, date | FR20170061007 | 21.11.2017 Original published format: FR 1761007 | [2020/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019101753 | Date: | 31.05.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3713444 | Date: | 30.09.2020 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A45D44/00, B41F15/08 | [2020/40] | CPC: |
A45D44/002 (EP,KR);
B41F15/04 (EP,KR);
A45D2200/1027 (EP,KR);
A45D2200/1036 (EP,KR);
B41M1/12 (EP,KR);
B41M3/006 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/40] | Title | German: | MASKE ZUR GESICHTSPFLEGE | [2020/40] | English: | MASK FOR FACE CARE | [2020/40] | French: | MASQUE DESTINÉ AUX SOINS DU VISAGE | [2020/40] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/40] | 11.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US2016089534 (MOHAMMADI FATEMEH [US], et al) [X] 1-8,10-13,15-17 * paragraphs [0003] , [0008] , [0011] , [0025] - [0082] * * figures 1,2,7 * [A] 18-21 [I] 9,14; | [XA]WO2016159477 (GENIC CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-12,18,19 * the whole document *[A] 20,21 |