EP3892046 - USER EQUIPMENT TRACKING AND PAGING AREA SELECTION IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.02.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.06.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (PUBL) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2021/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHANSSON, Åke Rådavägen 11B 435 43 PIXBO / SE | 02 /
SUN, Gang Hovås Rönnbärsgång 11 436 54 HOVÅS / SE | 03 /
DEREHAG, Jesper Myrebackavägen 305 442 93 KAREBY / SE | 04 /
NORLANDER, Magnus Lotsgatan 12 414 58 GÖTEBORG / SE | 05 /
MATTI, Mona Danielsvägen 2A 131 52 NACKA / SE | 06 /
JEONG, Jaeseong Signe Tillischgatan 9 169 73 SOLNA / SE | [2021/41] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2021/41] | Application number, filing date | 18816024.6 | 07.12.2018 | [2021/41] | WO2018EP83955 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020114606 | Date: | 11.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3892046 | Date: | 13.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W68/02 | [2021/41] | CPC: |
H04W68/02 (EP);
H04W68/005 (US);
H04W60/04 (US);
H04W36/00835 (EP);
H04W36/08 (EP);
H04W36/322 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/41] | Title | German: | BENUTZERGERÄTEVERFOLGUNG UND FUNKRUFBEREICHSAUSWAHL IN DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEMEN | [2021/41] | English: | USER EQUIPMENT TRACKING AND PAGING AREA SELECTION IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS | [2021/41] | French: | SUIVI D'ÉQUIPEMENT UTILISATEUR ET SÉLECTION DE ZONE DE RADIOMESSAGERIE DANS DES SYSTÈMES DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2021/41] | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/41] | 16.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2008102789 (SUNG KI-WON [KR]); | [A]US2014155109 (VAIDYA MAULIK [US], et al); | [A]US2015038180 (QUICK JR ROY FRANKLIN [US], et al); | [A]EP3046382 (ALCATEL LUCENT [FR]) |