EP3728048 - MACHINE AND METHOD FOR PACKAGING BY AT LEAST ONE STERILISATION PACKAGING MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.12.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.08.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sterimed SAS Route de Céret 66110 Amelie-les-Bains-Palalda / FR | [2020/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AUFFRAY, Clémentine 10, rue Max Wallet 66160 Le Boulou / FR | 02 /
SIMON, Christophe 1, rue des Caves 66480 Maureillas Las Illas / FR | 03 /
LEBRETTE, Laurent 4, place des Chardonnerets Lotissement Le Bosquet 66300 Tresserre / FR | [2020/44] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/44] | Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 18816096.4 | 17.12.2018 | [2020/44] | WO2018EP85319 | Priority number, date | FR20170062381 | 18.12.2017 Original published format: FR 1762381 | [2020/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019121571 | Date: | 27.06.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3728048 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3728048 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B65B11/58, B65B49/08, B65B51/06, B65B11/04, B65B55/00, // B65B61/06, B65B61/26 | [2021/36] | CPC: |
B65B49/08 (EP,US);
B65B11/045 (EP,US);
B65B11/48 (US);
B65B11/58 (EP,US);
B65B51/06 (EP,US);
B65B55/00 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/44] | B65B11/58, B65B49/08, B65B11/00, B65B51/06, B65B11/04, B65B61/06, B65B61/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MASCHINE UND VERFAHREN ZUM VERPACKEN MIT MINDESTENS EINEM STERILISATIONSVERPACKUNGSMATERIAL | [2020/44] | English: | MACHINE AND METHOD FOR PACKAGING BY AT LEAST ONE STERILISATION PACKAGING MATERIAL | [2020/44] | French: | MACHINE ET PROCÉDÉ POUR L'EMBALLAGE PAR AU MOINS UN MATERIAU D'EMBALLAGE DE STERILISATION | [2021/36] |
Former [2020/44] | MACHINE ET PROCÉDÉ POUR L'EMBALLAGE PAR AU MOINS UN MATÉRIAU D'EMBALLAGE DE STÉRILISATION | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/44] | 20.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.12.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.11.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.12.2018 | AL | 09.02.2022 | CY | 09.02.2022 | CZ | 09.02.2022 | DK | 09.02.2022 | EE | 09.02.2022 | FI | 09.02.2022 | HR | 09.02.2022 | LT | 09.02.2022 | LV | 09.02.2022 | MC | 09.02.2022 | MK | 09.02.2022 | MT | 09.02.2022 | PL | 09.02.2022 | RO | 09.02.2022 | RS | 09.02.2022 | SE | 09.02.2022 | SI | 09.02.2022 | SK | 09.02.2022 | SM | 09.02.2022 | TR | 09.02.2022 | BG | 09.05.2022 | NO | 09.05.2022 | GR | 10.05.2022 | IS | 09.06.2022 | PT | 09.06.2022 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 17.12.2018 | |
AL | 09.02.2022 | ||
CY | 09.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
MC | 09.02.2022 | ||
MK | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SI | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
TR | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 17.12.2018 | |
AL | 09.02.2022 | ||
CY | 09.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
MK | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SI | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/24] | HU | 17.12.2018 | |
AL | 09.02.2022 | ||
CY | 09.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SI | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 09.02.2022 | |
CY | 09.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SI | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 09.02.2022 | |
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SI | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 09.02.2022 | |
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | CZ | 09.02.2022 | |
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | CZ | 09.02.2022 | |
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | DK | 09.02.2022 | |
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | DK | 09.02.2022 | |
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | FI | 09.02.2022 | |
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | FI | 09.02.2022 | |
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | HR | 09.02.2022 | |
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | HR | 09.02.2022 | |
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | LT | 09.02.2022 | |
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 09.02.2022 | |
NO | 09.05.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB953551 (HEDWIG GAMBLE) [A] 1-35 * figures 1-5 *; | [A]US5502954 (AKIYAMA HEIEMON [JP], et al) [A] 1-35* figures 1-4, 7-19 *; | [A]EP1281617 (COPPENS VERPAKKINGS SYSTEMEN B [NL]) [A] 1-35 * paragraph [0028]; figures 1-6 *; | [A]EP1717149 (ATLANTA STRETCH S P A [IT]) [A] 1-35 * figure 1 * | by applicant | EP0707460 | EP1362557 |