EP3870143 - PERSONAL CARE COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.04.2023 Database last updated on 22.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.06.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York, NY 10022 / US | [2021/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Qiang 21 Bumiston Court Hillsborough, New Jersey 08844 / US | 02 /
CHENG, Shujiang 4 Chestnut Hill Warren, New Jersey 07059 / US | 03 /
DU-THUMM, Laurence 16 Woodfield Court Princeton, New Jersey 08540 / US | 04 /
ARMAS, Adriana Lomas de Sotelo 1120, Depto H401 Ciudad de México, CP 11200 / MX | 05 /
PARKER, Jodie 29 Winding Way Parsippany, New Jersey 07054 / US | 06 /
KOZUBAL, Cheryl 8 Angel Place Somerset, New Jersey 08873 / US | [2021/35] | Representative(s) | Wichmann, Hendrik Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/35] | Wichmann, Hendrik Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18816417.2 | 26.11.2018 | [2021/35] | WO2018US62411 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020112074 | Date: | 04.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3870143 | Date: | 01.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/49, A61K8/92, A61Q19/10, A61Q17/00 | [2021/35] | CPC: |
A61K8/4913 (EP,US);
A61K8/922 (EP,US);
A61Q17/005 (EP,US);
A61Q19/007 (US);
A61Q19/10 (EP,US);
A61K2800/591 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/35] | Title | German: | KÖRPERPFLEGEZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2021/35] | English: | PERSONAL CARE COMPOSITIONS | [2021/35] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE SOINS PERSONNELS | [2021/35] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/35] | 25.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9927904 (JOHNSON & SON INC S C [US]) [X] 1-6,8-10,12-20 * pages 15-18; examples 1,4,56, *; | [XI]US2003235550 (PAN ROBERT YA-LIN [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8-10,12-20 * page 8 - page 9; tables 1,2 * [I] 11; | [X]US2013230609 (MODAK SHANTA [US], et al) [X] 1-5,12-20 * page 13 *; | [XI]EP3159012 (LG BIONANO LLC [US]) [X] 1-6,8-10,12-20 * paragraphs [0157] - [0162] *[I] 7 |