EP3639501 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR DIFFERENTIATED IDENTIFICATION FOR CONFIGURATION AND OPERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.10.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Young Jones, June 824 Lily Street Monterey CA 93940 / US | [2022/47] |
Former [2022/39] | For all designated states Young Jones, June P.O. Box 3153 Los Altos, CA 94024 / US | ||
Former [2020/17] | For all designated states Jones, Michael, T. P.o. Box 3153 Los Altos, CA 94024 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jones, Michael Timothy - Deceased / US | [2022/39] |
Former [2020/17] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/17] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 18816540.1 | 13.06.2018 | [2020/17] | WO2018US37355 | Priority number, date | US201762520462P | 15.06.2017 Original published format: US 201762520462 P | US201816000832 | 05.06.2018 Original published format: US201816000832 | [2020/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018232001 | Date: | 20.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3639501 | Date: | 22.04.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.12.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3639501 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.12.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/31, G06F21/32, G06F21/62, G06F21/33, G06F21/45, H04L9/40 | [2023/22] | CPC: |
G06F21/33 (EP);
H04L63/102 (US);
G06F21/45 (EP);
G06F21/629 (EP);
H04L63/083 (US);
H04L63/10 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2022/21] | G06F21/31, G06F21/32, G06F21/62, G06F21/33, G06F21/45 | ||
Former IPC [2021/11] | H04L29/06, G06F21/31, G06F21/32, G06F21/62 | ||
Former IPC [2020/17] | H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR DIFFERENZIERTEN IDENTIFIKATION FÜR KONFIGURATION UND BETRIEB | [2020/17] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR DIFFERENTIATED IDENTIFICATION FOR CONFIGURATION AND OPERATION | [2020/17] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS D'IDENTIFICATION DIFFÉRENCIÉE PERMETTANT UNE CONFIGURATION ET UNE EXPLOITATION | [2020/17] | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 13.01.2020 | Search fee paid | 13.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/17] | 06.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 15.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.04.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 25.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 01.11.2023 | ES | 01.11.2023 | HR | 01.11.2023 | PL | 01.11.2023 | RS | 01.11.2023 | SK | 01.11.2023 | SM | 01.11.2023 | NO | 01.02.2024 | GR | 02.02.2024 | IS | 01.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 01.11.2023 | |
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 01.11.2023 | |
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 01.11.2023 | |
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 01.11.2023 | |
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 02.02.2024 | |
IS | 01.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2009259588 (LINDSAY JEFFREY DEAN [US]) [X] 1-15 * abstract ** paragraphs: 0019-0046, 0126-0147 * | International search | [Y]US2009259588 (LINDSAY JEFFREY DEAN [US]) [Y] 1-16* , abstract; para [0023], [0024], [0026], [0108], [0267], [0277], [0337] *; | [Y]US2015324577 (SINGH PRAVEEN KUMAR [IN], et al) [Y] 1-16 * , entire document especially abstract; para [0014], [0024]-[0031] * |