EP3626009 - METHOD AND DEVICES FOR MULTIPLE TRANSMIT RECEIVE POINT COOPERATION FOR RELIABLE COMMUNICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.08.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.02.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2020/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GONG, Zhengwei 129 Hearst Way Ottawa, Ontario K2L 4G5 / CA | 02 /
MAAREF, Amine 937 Fletcher Circle Ottawa, Ontario K2T 0B7 / CA | 03 /
BALIGH, Mohammadhadi 149 Saltspring Private Ottawa, Ontario K2M 0B1 / CA | 04 /
VILAIPORNSAWAI, Usa Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 05 /
FARMANBAR, Hamidreza 1146 Northgraves Crescent Ottawa, Ontario K2M 0E1 / CA | 06 /
JASSAL, Aman 951 Fletcher Circle Kanata, Ontario K2T 0B7 / CA | 07 /
XU, Hua 5 Appaloosa Drive Ottawa, Ontario K2M 1N6 / CA | 08 /
ISLAM, Toufiqul 905-25 Woodridge Crescent Ottawa, Ontario K2B 7T4 / CA | [2020/18] |
Former [2020/13] | 01 /
GONG, Zhengwei 129 Hearst Way Ottawa, Ontario K2L 4G5 / CA | ||
02 /
MAAREF, Amine 937 Fletcher Circle Ottawa, Ontario K2T 0B7 / CA | |||
03 /
BALIGH, Mohammadhadi 149 Saltspring Private Ottawa, Ontario K2M 0B1 / CA | |||
04 /
VILAIPORNSAWAI, Usa 705-15 Woodridge Crescent Nepean, Ontario K2B 7T3 / CA | |||
05 /
FARMANBAR, Hamidreza 1146 Northgraves Crescent Ottawa, Ontario K2M 0E1 / CA | |||
06 /
JASSAL, Aman 951 Fletcher Circle Kanata, Ontario K2T 0B7 / CA | |||
07 /
XU, Hua 5 Appaloosa Drive Ottawa, Ontario K2M 1N6 / CA | |||
08 /
ISLAM, Toufiqul 905-25 Woodridge Crescent Ottawa, Ontario K2B 7T4 / CA | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2020/13] | Application number, filing date | 18816754.8 | 14.06.2018 | [2020/13] | WO2018CN91326 | Priority number, date | US201762520510P | 15.06.2017 Original published format: US 201762520510 P | US201762568757P | 05.10.2017 Original published format: US 201762568757 P | [2020/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018228487 | Date: | 20.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3626009 | Date: | 25.03.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.12.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3626009 | Date: | 10.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 20.12.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04 | [2020/13] | CPC: |
H04W72/12 (EP);
H04W72/1273 (US);
H04L1/1635 (EP);
H04L1/1664 (EP);
H04L1/1822 (EP);
H04L1/1854 (EP);
H04L1/189 (EP);
H04L5/0044 (EP);
H04L5/0053 (EP);
H04L5/0055 (EP,US);
H04L5/0092 (EP);
H04W24/08 (US);
H04W72/1268 (US);
H04W72/23 (US);
H04W76/11 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR MEHRFACHSENDEEMPFANGSPUNKTKOOPERATION FÜR ZUVERLÄSSIGE KOMMUNIKATION | [2020/13] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICES FOR MULTIPLE TRANSMIT RECEIVE POINT COOPERATION FOR RELIABLE COMMUNICATION | [2020/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIFS POUR UNE COOPÉRATION DE POINTS MULTIPLES D'ÉMISSION-RÉCEPTION POUR UNE COMMUNICATION FIABLE | [2020/13] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2019 | Search fee paid | 17.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/13] | 27.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 17.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.01.2024 | BG | 10.01.2024 | ES | 10.01.2024 | HR | 10.01.2024 | LT | 10.01.2024 | LV | 10.01.2024 | NL | 10.01.2024 | PL | 10.01.2024 | SE | 10.01.2024 | NO | 10.04.2024 | RS | 10.04.2024 | GR | 11.04.2024 | IS | 10.05.2024 | PT | 10.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 10.01.2024 | |
BG | 10.01.2024 | ||
ES | 10.01.2024 | ||
HR | 10.01.2024 | ||
LT | 10.01.2024 | ||
LV | 10.01.2024 | ||
NL | 10.01.2024 | ||
PL | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
RS | 10.04.2024 | ||
GR | 11.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
PT | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 10.01.2024 | |
BG | 10.01.2024 | ||
ES | 10.01.2024 | ||
HR | 10.01.2024 | ||
LT | 10.01.2024 | ||
NL | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
RS | 10.04.2024 | ||
GR | 11.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 10.01.2024 | |
HR | 10.01.2024 | ||
LT | 10.01.2024 | ||
NL | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
RS | 10.04.2024 | ||
GR | 11.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 10.01.2024 | |
NL | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | NL | 10.01.2024 | |
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/31] | NL | 10.01.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2012269140 (NAM YOUNG-HAN [US], et al) [X] 1,12,13 * paragraph [0090] - paragraph [0100] * * paragraph [0140] - paragraph [0150] * * paragraph [0160] - paragraph [0170]; figure 4 * [A] 2-4 [I] 5-11; | [XI]US2014192734 (NG BOON LOONG [US], et al) [X] 1-4,12,13 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0100] * [I] 5-11; | [E]WO2018141246 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [E] 1-8,10,12,13 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0115] ** paragraph [0140] - paragraph [0150] * | International search | [A]CN102447529 (ZTE CORP) [A] 1-69 * the whole document *; | [A]CN103580810 (ZTE CORP) [A] 1-69 * the whole document *; | [A]US2014293843 (PAPASAKELLARIOU ARIS [US], et al) [A] 1-69 * abstract,description paragraphs [0011]-[0013], [0226] *; | [A]US2014321383 (WU YUCHUN [CN], et al) [A] 1-69* the whole document *; | [A]US2015237611 (AHN JOONKUI [KR], et al) [A] 1-69 * the whole document *; | [A]US2015245324 (KIM MYOUNGSEOB [KR], et al) [A] 1-69 * the whole document * |