EP3641199 - REFERENCE SIGNAL AND MESSAGE TRANSMISSION METHOD AND TRANSMISSION RESOURCE DETERMINATION METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.12.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2020/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Chao Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Xingwei Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
SUN, Yinghua Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
DU, Guanglong Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2020/17] | Representative(s) | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/17] | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18817482.5 | 14.06.2018 | [2020/17] | WO2018CN91339 | Priority number, date | CN201710453411 | 15.06.2017 Original published format: CN201710453411 | [2020/17] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018228492 | Date: | 20.12.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3641199 | Date: | 22.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3641199 | Date: | 26.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 20.12.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00, H04W72/04 | [2020/17] | CPC: |
H04L5/0048 (EP,CN,KR);
H04W72/53 (US);
H04L1/1812 (US);
H04L25/0226 (US);
H04L5/0051 (US);
H04L5/0053 (EP,KR);
H04L5/0064 (KR);
H04L5/0091 (CN);
H04L5/0094 (KR);
H04W72/0446 (US);
H04W72/21 (KR);
H04W72/566 (KR);
H04W72/04 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REFERENZSIGNAL- UND NACHRICHTENÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN SOWIE ÜBERTRAGUNGSRESSOURCENBESTIMMUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2020/17] | English: | REFERENCE SIGNAL AND MESSAGE TRANSMISSION METHOD AND TRANSMISSION RESOURCE DETERMINATION METHOD AND DEVICE | [2020/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION DE MESSAGE ET DE SIGNAL DE RÉFÉRENCE, ET PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE DÉTERMINATION DE RESSOURCE DE TRANSMISSION | [2020/17] | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.2020 | Translation filed | 13.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 13.01.2020 | Search fee paid | 13.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/17] | 26.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23169687.3 / EP4250847 | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.04.2023 | CZ | 26.04.2023 | DK | 26.04.2023 | EE | 26.04.2023 | ES | 26.04.2023 | FI | 26.04.2023 | HR | 26.04.2023 | IT | 26.04.2023 | LT | 26.04.2023 | LV | 26.04.2023 | MC | 26.04.2023 | PL | 26.04.2023 | RO | 26.04.2023 | RS | 26.04.2023 | SE | 26.04.2023 | SI | 26.04.2023 | SK | 26.04.2023 | SM | 26.04.2023 | IE | 14.06.2023 | LU | 14.06.2023 | BE | 30.06.2023 | CH | 30.06.2023 | NO | 26.07.2023 | GR | 27.07.2023 | IS | 26.08.2023 | PT | 28.08.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/24] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
CZ | 26.04.2023 | ||
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
MC | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SI | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
IE | 14.06.2023 | ||
LU | 14.06.2023 | ||
BE | 30.06.2023 | ||
CH | 30.06.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
CZ | 26.04.2023 | ||
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
MC | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
IE | 14.06.2023 | ||
LU | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/15] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
CZ | 26.04.2023 | ||
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
MC | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
LU | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
CZ | 26.04.2023 | ||
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
MC | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
CZ | 26.04.2023 | ||
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
MC | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 26.04.2023 | |
PT | 28.08.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2013195084 (CHEN WANSHI [US], et al); | [XAI]US2016135147 (OUCHI WATARU [JP], et al) | International search | [A]US2007104151 (PAPASAKELLARIOU ARIS [US], et al); | [X]CN101541029 (ZHONGXING TELECOMM EQUIP CO); | [A]CN102404854 (ZTE CORP); | [X]CN102761911 (CHINA MOBILE COMM CORP); | [A]US2014029428 (LIN ZHIRONG [CN], et al); | [A]CN103944665 (ZTE CORP); | [A]CN105308889 (LG ELECTRONICS INC); | [A]CN106254047 (BEIJING ZHIGU TECH SERVICE CO LTD) |