EP3640112 - VEHICULAR AIR-CONDITIONING APPARATUS AND AIR-CONDITIONING METHOD OF VEHICULAR AIR-CONDITIONING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.10.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2020/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TONE, Hiroaki c/o Mitsubishi Electric Engineering Co. Ltd. 13-5 Kudankita 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102-0073 / JP | 02 /
URAKAWA, Masatoshi c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2020/17] | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2020/17] | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 18818303.2 | 22.05.2018 | [2020/17] | WO2018JP19674 | Priority number, date | JP20170114882 | 12.06.2017 Original published format: JP 2017114882 | [2020/17] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018230278 | Date: | 20.12.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3640112 | Date: | 22.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3640112 | Date: | 17.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.12.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B61D27/00, B60H1/32, B60L1/00 | [2020/17] | CPC: |
B61D27/0018 (EP);
B60H1/00807 (US);
B60H1/00742 (US);
B60H1/32 (EP);
B60L1/00 (EP);
Y02T30/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGKLIMATISIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND KLIMATISIERUNGSVERFAHREN EINER FAHRZEUGKLIMATISIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2020/17] | English: | VEHICULAR AIR-CONDITIONING APPARATUS AND AIR-CONDITIONING METHOD OF VEHICULAR AIR-CONDITIONING APPARATUS | [2020/17] | French: | APPAREIL DE CLIMATISATION DE VÉHICULE ET PROCÉDÉ DE CLIMATISATION D'UN APPAREIL DE CLIMATISATION DE VÉHICULE | [2020/17] | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.2019 | Translation filed | 02.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.2019 | Search fee paid | 02.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/17] | 27.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.06.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.10.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
15.08.2022
17.08.2022
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Mobility GmbH Otto-Hahn-Ring 6 81739 München / DE Opponent's representative Siemens Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [2023/10] |
Former [2022/38] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.08.2022
17.08.2022
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Mobility GmbH Otto-Hahn-Ring 6 81739 München / DE | 06.09.2022 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 09.01.2023 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 21.03.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.05.2024 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 08.05.2024 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 18.07.2024 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2024/36] | Appeal following opposition | 04.07.2024 | Appeal received No. T0968/24 | 04.07.2024 | Payment of appeal fee | 18.07.2024 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.05.2018 | AL | 17.11.2021 | AT | 17.11.2021 | CY | 17.11.2021 | CZ | 17.11.2021 | DK | 17.11.2021 | EE | 17.11.2021 | ES | 17.11.2021 | FI | 17.11.2021 | HR | 17.11.2021 | LT | 17.11.2021 | LV | 17.11.2021 | MC | 17.11.2021 | MK | 17.11.2021 | MT | 17.11.2021 | NL | 17.11.2021 | PL | 17.11.2021 | RO | 17.11.2021 | RS | 17.11.2021 | SE | 17.11.2021 | SI | 17.11.2021 | SK | 17.11.2021 | SM | 17.11.2021 | BG | 17.02.2022 | NO | 17.02.2022 | GR | 18.02.2022 | IS | 17.03.2022 | PT | 17.03.2022 | IE | 22.05.2022 | LU | 22.05.2022 | BE | 31.05.2022 | CH | 31.05.2022 | LI | 31.05.2022 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/24] | HU | 22.05.2018 | |
AL | 17.11.2021 | ||
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CY | 17.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
MK | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
IE | 22.05.2022 | ||
LU | 22.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AL | 17.11.2021 | |
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CY | 17.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
MK | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
IE | 22.05.2022 | ||
LU | 22.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 17.11.2021 | |
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CY | 17.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
IE | 22.05.2022 | ||
LU | 22.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 17.11.2021 | |
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
IE | 22.05.2022 | ||
LU | 22.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 17.11.2021 | |
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
IE | 22.05.2022 | ||
LU | 22.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 17.11.2021 | |
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
LU | 22.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 17.11.2021 | |
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
LU | 22.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 17.11.2021 | |
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
MC | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 17.11.2021 | |
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SI | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 17.11.2021 | |
AT | 17.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
CZ | 17.11.2021 | ||
DK | 17.11.2021 | ||
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SK | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
EE | 17.11.2021 | ||
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RO | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
SM | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
NO | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
NL | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
SE | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
GR | 18.02.2022 | ||
IS | 17.03.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
ES | 17.11.2021 | ||
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
HR | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
LV | 17.11.2021 | ||
PL | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
PT | 17.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
FI | 17.11.2021 | ||
LT | 17.11.2021 | ||
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 17.11.2021 | |
RS | 17.11.2021 | ||
BG | 17.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 17.02.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1030131 (EMMERICH SATZGER) [A] 1,5 * the whole document *; | [A]CN103738345 (CSR QINGDAO SIFANG LOCOMOTIVE) [A] 1,5* abstract *; | [A]JP2016011046 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1,5 * abstract * * paragraph [0043] * | International search | [A]JP2002243242 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-7 * , paragraph [0025], fig. 3 & GB 2372312 A, specification, page 13, line 20 to page 14, line 7 *; | [A]JP2005082088 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-7 * , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2005178426 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-7 * , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2007083872 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP, et al) [A] 1-7 * , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2011137597 (HITACHI APPLIANCES INC) [A] 1-7 * , paragraphs [0030], [0035], fig. 4-5 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2012101626 (IHI CORP) [A] 1-7 * , paragraphs [0056]-[0057], fig. 5 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2016011046 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-7* , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) * | by applicant | JP2002243242 | JP2017114882 | Opposition | GB1030131 | DE19847504 | GB2372312 | JP2002243242 | WO02074600 | JP2005082088 | JP2005178426 | US2005194125 | JP2007083872 | DE602005000742T | WO2010145954 | JP2011137597 | JP2012101626 | CN103738345 | JP2016011046 | US9533550 | US9623722 | EP3074252 | - Hanns Amri ; Raphael N. Hofstadter ; Martin Kozek, "Energy efficient design and simulation of a demand controlled heating and ventilation unit in a metro vehicle", Integrated and Sustainable Transportation System (FISTS), 2011 IEEE Forum on, IEEE, (20110629), doi:10.1109/FISTS.2011.5973605, ISBN 978-1-4577-0990-6, pages 7 - 12, XP032006962 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/FISTS.2011.5973605 | - Conori Michael, "ECO Tram Handlungsmaßnahmen zur Energieverbrauchssenkung der Heiz-, Kühl-und Lüftungsgeräte ausgeführt zum Zwecke der Erlangung des akademischen Grades eines Diplom", DIPLOMARBEIT Vienna University of Technology, (20100101), DIPLOMARBEIT Vienna University of Technology, (20220913), XP055960671 | - Hofstädter Raphael N., Zero Thomas, Dullinger Christian, Richter Gregor, Kozek Martin, "Heat capacity and heat transfer coefficient estimation for a dynamic thermal model of rail vehicles", MATHEMATICAL AND COMPUTER MODELLING OF DYNAMICAL SYSTEMS, TAYLOR & FRANCIS THE NETHERLANDS, LEIDEN, NL, NL , (20170903), vol. 23, no. 5, doi:10.1080/13873954.2016.1263670, ISSN 1387-3954, pages 439 - 452, XP055960673 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/13873954.2016.1263670 | - Anonymous, "Konzept Klimatisierung", Siemens Infrastructure & Cities, (20120101), Siemens Infrastructure & Cities, (20220913), XP055960675 |