EP3639413 - ROBUST ULTRASOUND COMMUNICATION SIGNAL FORMAT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.01.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apple Inc. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2020/51] |
Former [2020/17] | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIN, Xintian E. 111 N. Rengstorff Avenue, Apt. 28 Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 02 /
ALMADA, Matias Javier 4424 Hedingham Lane Columbus, Georgia 31907 / US | 03 /
LI, Qinghua 5117 Chiltern Lane San Ramon, California 94582 / US | [2020/17] | Representative(s) | Wardle, Callum Tarn Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/17] | 2SPL Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 15 17 23 80050 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18818818.9 | 08.06.2018 | [2020/17] | WO2018US36748 | Priority number, date | US201762519024P | 13.06.2017 Original published format: US 201762519024 P | [2020/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018231652 | Date: | 20.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3639413 | Date: | 22.04.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.12.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 20.12.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04B11/00, H04L1/00 | [2020/17] | CPC: |
H04B11/00 (EP,US);
H04L1/0041 (EP,US);
H04L1/0045 (EP,US);
H04L1/0061 (EP,US);
H04L1/0071 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/17] | Title | German: | ROBUSTES ULTRASCHALLKOMMUNIKATIONSSIGNALFORMAT | [2020/17] | English: | ROBUST ULTRASOUND COMMUNICATION SIGNAL FORMAT | [2020/17] | French: | FORMAT DE SIGNAL DE COMMUNICATION ULTRASONORE ROBUSTE | [2020/17] | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 13.01.2020 | Search fee paid | 13.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/17] | 20.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2000021077 (SUMITOMO METAL IND) [Y] 2,3,13,14 * paragraph [0044] *; | [A]US2003212549 (STEENTRA JACK [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0025] , [0039] *; | [Y]US2005100117 (JENSEN JAMES R [US]) [Y] 8* figure 4 *; | [I]US2012197806 (HILL JASON LESTER [US]) [I] 1,4-7,9-12,15 * paragraphs [0090] , [0250] , [0254] , [0259] , [ 263]; figure 21A *; | [IY]US2014050321 (ALBERT DAVID E [US], et al) [I] 1,4-7,9-12,15 * figures 4A, 4B * * paragraphs [0073] , [0091] , [0094] , [0095] , [0099] * [Y] 2,3,8,13,14; | [I]US2015018660 (THOMSON EUAN [US], et al) [I] 1,4-7,9-12,15 * figures 1,3 * * paragraphs [0026] , [0027] * | International search | [Y]US2005010417 (HOLMES DAVID W [US]) [Y] 11, 19* See paragraph [0032]; and claims 1, 6. *; | [Y]US2005100117 (JENSEN JAMES R [US]) [Y] 2, 3, 9, 13, 14, 21, 22 * See paragraphs [0067]-[0069]; and claims 1-7. *; | [Y]US2014050321 (ALBERT DAVID E [US], et al) [Y] 1-25 * See paragraphs [0049]-[0117]; and figure 10. *; | [Y]US2016198197 (BAEK JONGSEOB [KR], et al) [Y] 1-25 * See paragraphs [0124]-[0222]. *; | [Y]KR101744854B (TAIHOINST CO., LTD.) [Y] 4-7, 15, 16, 23-25 * 9 3 5 * | by applicant | US2012197806 | US2014050321 |