EP3640285 - WATER-SOLUBLE FILM, CHEMICAL AGENT PACKAGE, AND METHOD OF PRODUCING WATER-SOLUBLE FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/17] | WATER-SOLUBLE FILM, DRUG PACKAGE, AND PRODUCTION METHOD FOR WATER-SOLUBLE FILM | ||
[2024/12] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 1-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | [2020/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIURA, Takahiro c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 1-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1008251 / JP | [2020/17] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [2020/17] | Application number, filing date | 18818868.4 | 12.06.2018 | [2020/17] | WO2018JP22493 | Priority number, date | JP20170115132 | 12.06.2017 Original published format: JP 2017115132 | [2020/17] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018230583 | Date: | 20.12.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3640285 | Date: | 22.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3640285 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.12.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B29B7/00, B29B7/72, B29B7/88, B29C41/28, C08F216/06, C08K5/00, C08L29/04, C11D3/37, B29C55/02, C08J5/18, C11D17/04, B29K29/00 | [2024/10] | CPC: |
B29C41/28 (EP);
C11D17/043 (EP,US);
B29B7/007 (EP);
B29B7/726 (EP);
B29B7/88 (EP);
B29C41/003 (US);
B29C41/24 (US);
B29C41/46 (US);
B29C55/02 (EP);
B65D65/46 (US);
C08J5/18 (EP,US);
C08L29/04 (EP);
C11D3/3753 (EP,US);
B29K2029/04 (EP,US);
B29L2007/008 (US);
C08F216/06 (EP);
C08J2300/14 (EP);
C08J2329/04 (EP,US);
C08J2429/04 (EP);
C08K2201/014 (EP);
C08K5/0016 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C08L29/04, C08L29/04, C08L3/02, C08K5/053 (EP);
C08F216/06, C08F218/08, C08F222/16 (EP) |
Former IPC [2020/23] | C08J5/18, B29C41/24, B29C55/02, B65D65/46, B29K29/00, B29L7/00, C11D3/37, C11D17/04 | ||
Former IPC [2020/17] | C08J5/18, B29C41/24, B29C55/02, B65D65/46, B29K29/00, B29L7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WASSERLÖSLICHE FOLIE, VERPACKUNG FÜR CHEMIKALIEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER WASSERLÖSLICHEN FOLIE | [2024/12] | English: | WATER-SOLUBLE FILM, CHEMICAL AGENT PACKAGE, AND METHOD OF PRODUCING WATER-SOLUBLE FILM | [2024/12] | French: | FILM SOLUBLE DANS L'EAU, EMBALLAGE D'AGENT CHIMIQUE ET MÉTHODE DE PRODUCTION D'UN FILM SOLUBLE DANS L'EAU | [2024/12] |
Former [2020/17] | WASSERLÖSLICHER FILM, ARZNEIMITTELVERPACKUNG UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR WASSERLÖSLICHEN FILM | ||
Former [2020/17] | WATER-SOLUBLE FILM, DRUG PACKAGE, AND PRODUCTION METHOD FOR WATER-SOLUBLE FILM | ||
Former [2020/17] | FILM SOLUBLE DANS L'EAU, EMBALLAGE DE MÉDICAMENT, ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE FILM SOLUBLE DANS L'EAU | Entry into regional phase | 30.10.2019 | Translation filed | 30.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 30.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 30.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/17] | 01.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2012002194 (NIPPON SYNTHETIC CHEM IND [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,8 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0105]; example 1 *; | [X]WO2017043509 (NIPPON SYNTHETIC CHEM IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-8 * WPI abstract *; | [E]US2018245028 (OOKUBO MASANORI [JP], et al) [E] 1-8 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0104] - paragraph [0105] ** paragraph [0154] - paragraph [0173]; examples 1-5 * | International search | [Y]JPS474315B [Y] 1-2 * , *; | [A]JPH01281085 (SHOWA DENKO KK) [A] 1-8 * , *; | [A]JPH0481947U [A] 1-8 * , *; | [X]JP2001315141 (KURARAY CO) [X] 1-2, 8 * , *; | [Y]JP2002284905 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [Y] 1-2 * , *; | [A]JP2017102438 (NIPPON SYNTHETIC CHEM IND CO LTD:THE) [A] 1-8* , * | Examination | US2007298234 | US2011189413 | by applicant | WO2017043508 |