EP3714168 - A FAN AND AN AIR CONDITIONING UNIT COMPRISING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARTUS AIR LIMITED 8 Fitzroy Street London W1T 4BJ / GB | [2021/41] |
Former [2020/40] | For all designated states Ove Arup Ventures Limited 13 Fitzroy Street London W1T 4BQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOCKWOOD, Geoffrey Mark c/o emb-papst UK Ltd, Springfield Lyons Approach Chelmsford Business Park Chelmsford, Essex CM2 5EZ / GB | [2020/40] | Representative(s) | Dolleymores 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford, Hertfordshire WD18 0JU / GB | [2020/40] | Application number, filing date | 18819345.2 | 06.12.2018 | [2020/40] | WO2018GB53534 | Priority number, date | GB20170021773 | 22.12.2017 Original published format: GB 201721773 | [2020/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019122814 | Date: | 27.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3714168 | Date: | 30.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3714168 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F04D29/52, F04D29/54, F04D29/60, F24F1/0011, F24F1/0029 | [2020/40] | CPC: |
F04D29/522 (EP);
F04D19/002 (GB,US);
F24F1/0029 (EP,GB,US);
F04D25/06 (US);
F04D29/545 (EP);
F04D29/601 (EP,GB,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEBLÄSE UND KLIMAANLAGENEINHEIT DAMIT | [2020/40] | English: | A FAN AND AN AIR CONDITIONING UNIT COMPRISING THE SAME | [2020/40] | French: | VENTILATEUR ET UNITÉ DE CLIMATISATION LE COMPRENANT | [2020/40] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/40] | 23.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2252064 (CORNELL JR EDWARD S); | [A]US5120193 (KADLE DURGAPRASAD S [US], et al); | [X]JP2001065491 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]US2012219398 (SHEARD ANTHONY GEOFFREY [GB], et al); | [X]US2013149115 (CHANG SHUN-CHEN [TW], et al); | [XDAI]WO2016016659 (OVE ARUP & PARTNERS INTERNAT LTD [GB]) |